EP2407590 - Method for operating a clothes drying appliance and clothes drying appliance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2012/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jablonski, Piotr / Gladka 45 m.2 93-378 Lodz / PL | [2012/03] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/03] | Application number, filing date | 10169428.9 | 13.07.2010 | [2012/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2407590 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/28 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
D06F58/38 (EP,US);
D06F2103/10 (EP,US);
D06F2103/44 (EP,US);
D06F34/08 (EP,US);
D06F34/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betrieb eines Wäschetrockners und Wäschetrockner | [2012/03] | English: | Method for operating a clothes drying appliance and clothes drying appliance | [2012/03] | French: | Procédé pour le fonctionnement d'un appareil de séchage de vêtements et appareil de séchage de vêtements | [2012/03] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/03] | 24.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3327403 (HOOD ROBERT B) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1443139 (E G O CONTROL SYSTEMS GMBH & C [DE]) [X] 1,10,11* paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0025]; figure - *; | [X]WO2009064143 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1,10 * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0081]; figure - * |