EP2243919 - Manipulatable spider components adapted for cooperation with a vertically reciprocating control line guide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Frank's International, LLC 10260 Westheimer Road, Suite 700 Houston, TX 77042 / US | [2014/50] |
Former [2010/43] | For all designated states Frank's International, Inc. 10260 Westheimer Road Suite 700 Houston TX 77042 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Webre, Charles Michael 111 Oak Forest Drive Lafayette, TX 70501 / US | 02 /
Bouligny, Vernon Joseph P.O. Box 12027 New Iberia, TX 70562 / US | 03 /
Begnaud, Brian David 108 Piedmont Youngsville, TX 70592 / US | 04 /
Sibille, Mark Stephen 296 Lark Drive Lafayette, TX 70506 / US | [2010/43] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | Giles, Ashley Simon Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 10169455.2 | 08.03.2007 | [2010/43] | Priority number, date | US20060371742 | 09.03.2006 Original published format: US 371742 | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2243919 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2243919 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E21B17/02, E21B19/10 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
E21B19/10 (EP,BR,NO,US);
E21B17/02 (BR);
E21B17/026 (EP,NO,US);
E21B19/00 (EP,NO,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, NL [2016/22] |
Former [2010/43] | FR, GB, NL | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Für Zusammenspiel mit einem vertikal oszillierenden Steuerleitungsführer adaptierte manipulierbare Drehkreuzkomponenten | [2010/43] | English: | Manipulatable spider components adapted for cooperation with a vertically reciprocating control line guide | [2010/43] | French: | Composants de croisillon manipulables adaptés pour la coopération avec un guide de ligne de contrôle verticalement alternatif | [2010/43] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 04.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07800146.8 / EP1991756 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070800146) is 22.12.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6920931 (WEBRE CHARLES MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * figure 1 * * figures 12A,12B * * claim 1d *; | [AP]WO2006058056 (FRANK S INR INC [US]) [AP] 1 * page 4, lines 17-21; figures 1,4 * * page 7, columns 1-19 *; | [AP]WO2006058055 (FRANK S INR INC [US]) [AP] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | EP20070800146 |