EP2244520 - Signalling scheduling assistance data in a cellular communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/43] | Signalling scheduling assitance data in a cellular communication system | ||
[2010/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2015/48] |
Former [2010/43] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Nicholas William 72 London Road Warmley Bristol, BS30 5JL / GB | 02 /
Beale, Martin Warwick 9 Walker Street Kingsdown Bristol, BS2 8HE / GB | 03 /
Legg, Peter Jonathon 10 Bakers Road Wroughton Wiltshire, SN4 0RP / GB | [2010/43] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/48] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2010/43] | DeVile, Jonathan Mark D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10169456.0 | 09.02.2006 | [2010/43] | Priority number, date | GB20050008801 | 03.05.2005 Original published format: GB 0508801 | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2244520 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2244520 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | [2010/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2244520 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
H04L1/0041 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/21 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0067 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/007 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0072 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/08 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/1812 (KR);
H04L1/1867 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/20 (EP,KR,US);
H04W8/04 (KR,US);
H04L2001/0098 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/1268 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/48] |
Former [2010/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Signalisierung von Hilfsdaten zur Signalisierungsplanung in einem zellularen Kommunikationssystem | [2010/43] | English: | Signalling scheduling assistance data in a cellular communication system | [2010/44] | French: | Signalisation de la programmation des données d'assistance dans un système de communication cellulaire | [2010/43] |
Former [2010/43] | Signalling scheduling assitance data in a cellular communication system | Examination procedure | 03.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 29.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 12.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06708151.3 / EP1886522 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060708151) is 30.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.02.2006 | AT | 25.11.2015 | BG | 25.11.2015 | CY | 25.11.2015 | CZ | 25.11.2015 | DK | 25.11.2015 | EE | 25.11.2015 | ES | 25.11.2015 | FI | 25.11.2015 | LT | 25.11.2015 | LV | 25.11.2015 | MC | 25.11.2015 | PL | 25.11.2015 | RO | 25.11.2015 | SE | 25.11.2015 | SI | 25.11.2015 | SK | 25.11.2015 | TR | 25.11.2015 | IE | 09.02.2016 | LU | 09.02.2016 | GR | 26.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | IS | 25.03.2016 | PT | 25.03.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 09.02.2006 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
TR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 09.02.2016 | ||
LU | 09.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 09.02.2006 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 09.02.2016 | ||
LU | 09.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 09.02.2016 | ||
LU | 09.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
LU | 09.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
LU | 09.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
LU | 09.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6778509 (RAVISHANKAR CHANNASANDRA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 7, line 1 - line 16 *; | [A]US2004224677 (KUCHIBHOTLA RAVI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0045]; figures 3,5 *; | [A]US2005053035 (KWAK YONG-JUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0020]; figures 3-5 *; | [A] - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Medium Access Control (MAC) protocol specification (3GPP TS 25.321 version 6.3.0 Release 6); ETSI TS 125 321", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200412), vol. 3-R2, no. V630, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014027655 [A] 1-15 * page 25 - page 27 * |