EP2242127 - Battery packs suitable for use with battery powered appliances [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Makita Corporation 3-11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken 446-8502 / JP | [2010/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAKIBARA, Kazuyuki c/o Makita Corporation 3-11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo Aichi 446-8502 / JP | [2013/10] |
Former [2010/42] | 01 /
SAKAKIBARA, Kazuyuki c/o Makita Corporation 3-11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo Aichi 446-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/42] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Straße 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10169529.4 | 29.10.2002 | [2010/42] | Priority number, date | JP20010337045 | 01.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001337045 | [2010/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2242127 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2242127 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/02, H01M2/10, H01M10/48, H01M10/50 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
H01M10/486 (EP,US);
H01M50/213 (EP,US);
H01M10/613 (EP,US);
H01M10/6235 (EP,US);
H01M10/643 (EP,US);
H01M10/6563 (EP,US);
H01M10/6566 (EP,US);
H01M50/24 (EP,US);
H01M10/345 (EP,US);
H01M10/6554 (EP,US);
H01M50/107 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/42] | H01M2/10, H01M10/50, H01M2/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2010/42] | Title | German: | Batteriesätze für Batteriegespeistes Gerät | [2010/42] | English: | Battery packs suitable for use with battery powered appliances | [2010/42] | French: | Bloc à piles pour appareil alimenté par piles | [2010/42] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 28.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02024128.7 / EP1309019 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020024128) is 11.01.2006 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 06.03.2013 | NL | 06.03.2013 | ES | 17.06.2013 | [2014/11] |
Former [2013/48] | NL | 06.03.2013 | |
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | ES | 17.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5589290 (KLINK RAINER [DE], et al) [A] 2 * column 1, lines 24-31 *; | [A]US5593794 (WEI GUANG [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 2, lines 44-67 *; | [Y]EP0813265 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * page 4, lines 21-23 * * figures 1-14 * * claims 1-13 *; | [A]WO9831059 (OVONIC BATTERY CO [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 8, lines 17-21 * * page 35, line 2 - page 37, line 3 * * claim 152 *; | [A]EP0975031 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US6087038 (FLAMENT PASCAL [FR], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]EP1026770 (TOSHIBA BATTERY [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0014]; claim 3 *; | [A]DE10003247 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * column 7, lines 58-61 *; | [A]US6211645 (KOUZU KATSUMI [JP], et al) [A] 2 * column 6, lines 16-25 *; | [A]EP1109237 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [Y]DE10055158 (MAKITA CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2001203004 (MAKITA CORP) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | by applicant | US117531 | US148289 | US279867 | US5909101 | US5912546 | EP0940864 | EP0994523 | US6066938 | US6075347 | US6124698 | US6191554 | US6191560 | US6204640 | US6204641 | US6225786 | US6229280 | US6275009 | US6278261 | US6362600 | US6373228 | US6404167 | US6433515 | US6433517 |