EP2278443 - MULTI-TOUCH DETECTION METHOD FOR TOUCH PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/04] | Multi-touch detection method for touch panel | ||
[2015/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InnoLux Corporation No. 160 Kesyue Road Chu-Nan Site Hsinchu Science Park Chu-Nan 350, Taipei / TW | [2016/15] |
Former [2011/04] | For all designated states Chimei InnoLux Corporation No. 160 Kesyue Road Chu-Nan Site Hsinchu Science Park Chu-Nan 350, Taipei / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Po-Yang Chimei InnoLux Corporation No. 160 Kesyue Rd. Chu-Nan Site Hsinchu Science Park 350 Chu-Nan / TW | 02 /
Shin, Po-Sheng Chimei InnoLux Corporation No. 160 Kesyue Rd. Chu-Nan Site Hsinchu Science Park 350 Chu-Nan / TW | 03 /
Cheng, Chien-Yung Chimei InnoLux Corporation No. 160 Kesyue Rd. Chu-Nan Site Hsinchu Science Park 350 Chu-Nan / TW | 04 /
Pan, Hsuan-Lin Chimei InnoLux Corporation No. 160 Kesyue Rd. Chu-Nan Site Hsinchu Science Park 350 Chu-Nan / TW | [2016/16] |
Former [2011/04] | 01 /
Chen, Po-Yang Chimei InnoLux Corporation No. 160 Kesyue Rd. Chu-Nan Site Hsinchu Science Park 350 Chu-Nan / TW | ||
02 /
Shin, Po-Sheng Chimei InnoLux Corporation No. 160 Kesyue Rd. Chu-Nan Site Hsinchu Science Park 350 Chu-Nan / TW | |||
03 /
Cheng, Chien-Yung Chimei InnoLux Corporation No. 160 Kesyue Rd. Chu-Nan Site Hsinchu Science Park 350 Chu-Nan / TW | |||
04 /
Pan, Hsuan-Lin Chimei InnoLux Corporation No. 160 Kesyue Rd. Chu-Nan Site Hsinchu Science Park 350 Chu-Nan / TW | Representative(s) | Jones, Keith William, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2016/16] |
Former [2011/04] | Gray, John James Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 10169707.6 | 15.07.2010 | [2011/04] | Priority number, date | CN200910304811 | 24.07.2009 Original published format: CN200910304811 | [2011/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2278443 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2278443 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2278443 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F3/045 | [2015/50] | CPC: |
G06F3/0416 (US);
G06F3/04166 (EP,KR);
G06F3/045 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,KR,US);
G06F2203/04104 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/50] | G06F3/041, G06F3/045, G06F3/048 | ||
Former IPC [2011/04] | G06F3/041, G06F3/045 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] |
Former [2011/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEHRBERÜHRUNGSERKENNUNGSVEFAHREN FÜR EINEN BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRM | [2015/50] | English: | MULTI-TOUCH DETECTION METHOD FOR TOUCH PANEL | [2015/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'EFFLEUREMENTS MULTIPLES POUR PANNEAU TACTILE | [2015/50] |
Former [2011/04] | Mehrberührungserkennungsvefahren für einen Berührungsbildschirm | ||
Former [2011/04] | Multi-touch detection method for touch panel | ||
Former [2011/04] | Procédé de détection d'effleurements multiples pour panneau tactile | Examination procedure | 11.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/30] | 15.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 16.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 16.09.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 16.09.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.09.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.07.2010 | AL | 20.04.2016 | AT | 20.04.2016 | BE | 20.04.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | CY | 20.04.2016 | CZ | 20.04.2016 | DK | 20.04.2016 | EE | 20.04.2016 | ES | 20.04.2016 | FI | 20.04.2016 | HR | 20.04.2016 | IS | 20.04.2016 | IT | 20.04.2016 | LT | 20.04.2016 | LV | 20.04.2016 | MC | 20.04.2016 | MK | 20.04.2016 | NL | 20.04.2016 | PL | 20.04.2016 | RO | 20.04.2016 | SE | 20.04.2016 | SI | 20.04.2016 | SK | 20.04.2016 | SM | 20.04.2016 | TR | 20.04.2016 | IE | 15.07.2016 | LU | 15.07.2016 | NO | 20.07.2016 | GR | 21.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | PT | 22.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 15.07.2010 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 15.07.2016 | ||
LU | 15.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/33] | HU | 15.07.2010 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 15.07.2016 | ||
LU | 15.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 15.07.2010 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 15.07.2016 | ||
LU | 15.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 15.07.2010 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 15.07.2016 | ||
LU | 15.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 15.07.2010 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 15.07.2016 | ||
LU | 15.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 15.07.2016 | ||
LU | 15.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 20.04.2016 | |
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 20.04.2016 | |
NO | 20.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2008296073 (MCDERMID WILLIAM J [US]) [I] 1-3,5-16,18-21 * figures 3,9-12 * * paragraph [87. 92] * [Y] 4,17; | [Y]EP2073109 (UNIV TSING HUA [CN], et al) [Y] 4,17 * figure 5 * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0046] *; | [A]US2009174675 (GILLESPIE DAVE [US], et al) [A] 1,13 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1,3-5 * | by applicant | US2006097991 | US2008158181 | TW200920689 |