EP2237465 - Selection of training sequences in a multiple-in multiple-out (MIMO) communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Darwood, Peter 8 Bishop Road Bristol BS7 8LT / GB | 02 /
Ponnampalam, Vishakan 24 Royal Albert Road Bristol BS6 7NY / GB | 03 /
Jones, Alan 21 Petty Lane Derry Hill Calne Wiltshire SN11 9QY / GB | [2011/19] |
Former [2010/40] | 01 /
Darwood, Peter 78 Forres Road Crookes Sheffield, Yorkshire S10 1WE / GB | ||
02 /
Ponnampalam, Vishakan 24 Royal Albert Road Bristol BS6 7NY / GB | |||
03 /
Jones, Alan 21 Petty Lane Derry Hill Calne Wiltshire SN11 9QY / GB | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | DeVile, Jonathan Mark D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10169722.5 | 01.02.2006 | [2010/40] | Priority number, date | US20050061958 | 17.02.2005 Original published format: US 61958 | [2010/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2237465 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2237465 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/02, H04L1/06, H04L5/00 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
H04L5/0023 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0684 (KR,US);
H04B1/7105 (KR,US);
H04B7/0413 (KR,US);
H04B7/0632 (US);
H04B7/0851 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2010/40] | H04L1/06, H04L25/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/40] | Title | German: | Auswahl von Trainingssequenzen in einem Mehreingangs-Mehrausgangs-(MIMO)Kommunikationssystem | [2010/40] | English: | Selection of training sequences in a multiple-in multiple-out (MIMO) communication system | [2010/40] | French: | Sélection de séquences d'apprentissage dans un système de communication à entrées multiples sorties multiples (MIMO) | [2010/40] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 08.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/48] | 19.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/48] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06707969.9 / EP1854256 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060707969) is 03.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1185048 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0028] ** figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2004006477 (ARRAYCOMM INC [US]) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * page 5, line 9 - line 23 * * claims 1-2 *; | [Y]US2004008760 (DOGAN MITHAT C [US]) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0022] *; | [Y]WO2004073276 (DOCOMO COMM LAB EUROPE GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 3 * * page 7, paragraph 5 *; | [Y]EP1473862 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * * tables 1, 2 * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * table 3 * * claims 1-5 * * figures 1,2, 5 *; | [A] - LEI M ET AL, "CHANNEL ESTIMATION BASED ON MIDAMBLE IN UNTRA-TDD SYSTEM", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TELECOMMUNICATIONSICT, (20020623), vol. 2, pages 434 - 438, XP008028023 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |