EP2277652 - Saw blade including teeth having a chip deforming element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WIKUS-Sägenfabrik Wilhelm H. Kullmann GmbH & Co. KG Melsunger Strasse 30 34286 Spangenberg / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2011/04] | For all designated states WIKUS-Sägenfabrik Wilhelm H. Kullmann GmbH & Co. KG. Melsunger Strasse 30 34286 Spangenberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kullmann, Dr. Jörg H. Zum Steinbach 2 34286, Spangenberg / DE | 02 /
Carrier, Frank Friedenstraße 13 34277, Fuldabrück / DE | [2014/07] |
Former [2011/04] | 01 /
Kullmann, Dr. Jörg H. Zum Steinbach 2 34286, Spangenberg / DE | ||
02 /
Carrier, Frank Friedenstraße 13 34277, Fuldabrück / DE | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte Nikolausberger Weg 62 37073 Göttingen / DE | ||
Former [2011/04] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Patentanwälte Nikolausberger Weg 62 37073 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10169970.0 | 19.07.2010 | [2011/04] | Priority number, date | DE20091027896 | 21.07.2009 Original published format: DE102009027896 | [2011/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2277652 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2277652 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2277652 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B23D61/02, B23D61/12 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
B23D61/021 (EP,US);
B23D61/121 (EP,US);
Y10T83/9317 (EP,US);
Y10T83/935 (EP,US);
Y10T83/9358 (EP,US);
Y10T83/9362 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/04] | Title | German: | Sägeblatt mit Zähnen mit einem Spanumformelement | [2011/04] | English: | Saw blade including teeth having a chip deforming element | [2011/04] | French: | Lame de scie ayant des dents dotées d'un élément de déformation de copeaux | [2011/04] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 27.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2010 | AL | 12.02.2014 | BG | 12.02.2014 | CY | 12.02.2014 | CZ | 12.02.2014 | DK | 12.02.2014 | EE | 12.02.2014 | FI | 12.02.2014 | HR | 12.02.2014 | LT | 12.02.2014 | LV | 12.02.2014 | MC | 12.02.2014 | MK | 12.02.2014 | MT | 12.02.2014 | RO | 12.02.2014 | SM | 12.02.2014 | GR | 13.05.2014 | PT | 12.06.2014 | LU | 19.07.2014 | BE | 31.07.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 19.07.2010 | |
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
MK | 12.02.2014 | ||
MT | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SM | 12.02.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 19.07.2010 | |
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
MT | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SM | 12.02.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
MT | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SM | 12.02.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SM | 12.02.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 12.02.2014 | |
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.02.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE4200423 (KULLMANN WIKUS SAEGENFAB [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP1101558 (KANEFUSA KNIFE & SAW [JP]) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102008037407 (ROBERT ROENTGEN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * * insbesondere: * * paragraph [0066] *; | [A]DE1628893 (NAEPFLIN HANS) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE4200423 | DE10030168 | EP1101558 | DE102006015278 |