EP2409748 - Device and method for removing gas from flotation foam and flotation assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kummer, Dominik Stadtweg 17 85435, Erding / DE | [2012/04] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/04] | Application number, filing date | 10170310.6 | 21.07.2010 | [2012/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2409748 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01D19/02, B05B3/04 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
B01D19/0052 (EP);
B01D19/0063 (EP);
B05B3/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Entgasung von Flotationsschaum, sowie Flotationsanlage | [2012/04] | English: | Device and method for removing gas from flotation foam and flotation assembly | [2012/04] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de dégazage d'écume de flottation, et installation de flottation | [2012/04] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/03] | 31.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1286056 (INST NAT RECH CHIMIQUE) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE3012198 (AGRO BIOGAS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-18 * Seite 8 dritter Paragraph;; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]GB1309173 (CREUSOT LOIRE) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3296776 (YOUNGMAN CARL A) [Y] 1-18 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 33; figures 1,3; claim 1 *; | [Y]US4956100 (MIKKLESON KENNETH A [US]) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * column 1, lines 7-19 * * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 24 *; | [Y]US4339205 (KATO KOCHI, et al) [Y] 1-18 * abstract *; | [Y]US4310437 (SCHREIBER ANSELM) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 44 *; | [A]US2610155 (HUMFELD H.) [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE20204981U | DE4009042 | DE102008030531 | WO2006069995 |