EP2409849 - Combination of a luminescent material with a hologram [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony DADC Austria AG Sonystrasse 20 5081 Anif / AT | For all designated states Swiss Authentication Research and Development AG C/o Capital Management AG Konstanzerstrasse 17 8274 Tägerwilen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | For all designated states Sony DADC Austria AG Sonystrasse 20 5081 Anif / AT | ||
For all designated states Swiss Authentication Research and Development AG c/o Capital Management AG Konstanzerstrasse 17 8274 Tägerwilen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ebert, Dieter / Kirchstrasse 19 8274, Gottlieben / CH | 02 /
Perlot, Stefan / Bergstrasse 57 5300, Hallwang / AT | 03 /
Höpoldseder, Erich / Augasse 32 5081, Anif / AT | [2012/04] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Wolfgang Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Weiss, Wolfgang Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10170447.6 | 22.07.2010 | [2012/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2409849 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B41M3/14, B42D15/10, D21H21/48, G07D7/12 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
B41M3/144 (EP);
D21H21/48 (EP);
G07D7/0032 (EP);
G07D7/1205 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kombination eines Lumineszenzstoffes mit einem Hologramm | [2012/04] | English: | Combination of a luminescent material with a hologram | [2012/04] | French: | Combinaison d'une substance luminescente et d'un hologramme | [2012/04] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/03] | 31.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2004102490 (BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10,12 * abstract * * page 1, line 8 - page 7, line 18 * * page 9, line 14 - page 13, line 15 * * figures 3-4 * [Y] 7 [I] 4-6,11; | [XYI]EP1854642 (JDS UNIPHASE CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,8-10,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0069] - [0071] * * figure 4 * [Y] 7 [I] 3-6,11; | [XYI]WO2010046708 (DRINKWATER KENNETH JOHN [GB]) [X] 1,2,8-10,12 * abstract * * pages 2-3,7,10 * * page 17-25 (items 24, 44, 59) * [Y] 7 [I] 3-6,11; | [XYI]US2004099740 (CHRESAND THOMAS J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8-10,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0026] - [0037] * * example 1 * * claims 1-11 * [Y] 7 [I] 3-6,11; | [XYI]DE102007058888 (INFORMIUM AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,8-10,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0016] * [Y] 7 [I] 3-6,11; | [XYI]WO9946133 (RUE DE INT LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,8-10,12 * abstract * * page 4, lines 5-16 * * claims 14-20 * [Y] 7 [I] 3-6,11; | [YA]US5453340 (KAWABATA MASAMI [JP], et al) [Y] 7 * the whole document * [A] 1-6,8-12 | by applicant | WO0060527 | WO2008000461 | US6802992 | US6686074 | US5453340 | US2009286165 |