EP2278627 - Automatic localisation of photovoltaic modules in a photovoltaic field [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Photowatt International S.A. 33, rue Saint Honoré, ZI Champfleuri 38300 Bourgoin-Jallieu / FR | [2011/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allandrieu, Frantz 10 chemin de la Tour - Pollet 01800 Saint Maurice de Gourdans / FR | 02 /
Aurousseau, Valery 50 rue des Capucines 38110 St Clair de la Tour / FR | 03 /
Dumas, Philippe 183 route des Vignes 38890 Saint Chef / FR | [2011/04] | Representative(s) | Verriest, Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [2014/11] |
Former [2011/04] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10170653.9 | 23.07.2010 | [2011/04] | Priority number, date | FR20090055144 | 23.07.2009 Original published format: FR 0955144 | [2011/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2278627 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/042 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
H04Q9/00 (EP);
H02S50/10 (EP);
H04Q2209/40 (EP);
H04Q2209/886 (EP);
Y02B10/10 (EP);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/04] | Extension states | BA | 28.03.2011 | ME | 28.03.2011 | RS | 28.03.2011 | Title | German: | Automatische Lokalisierung von Fotovoltaik-Modulen in einem Fotovoltaik-Feld | [2011/04] | English: | Automatic localisation of photovoltaic modules in a photovoltaic field | [2011/04] | French: | Localisation automatique de modules photovoltaïques dans un champ photovoltaïque | [2011/04] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/18] | 09.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/27] | 21.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]GB2425884 (LONTRA ENVIRONMENTAL TECHNOLOG [GB]) [I] 1-15 * figure 3 et texte associé * * page 11, lines 1-23 * * page 18, lines 22-25 * * page 26, lines 11-12 * * page 1, lines 6-9 *; | [I]US2006162772 (PRESHER GORDON E JR [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 1, 2, 6, 10 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0010] , [0050] - [0053] - [0088] , [0089] , [0118] - [0121] * |