EP2282561 - Messaging in mobile telecommunications networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vodafone Group plc The Connection Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | [2011/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pudney, Christopher Vodafone Group Services Limited R&D The Connection Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | 02 /
Russell, Nick Vodafone Group Services Limited R&D The Connection Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | 03 /
Wong, Gavin c/o Vodafone Group Services Ltd. R&D The Connection Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | [2011/51] |
Former [2011/33] | 01 /
Pudney, Christopher Vodafone Group Services Limited R&D The Connection Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | ||
02 /
Russell, Nick Vodafone Group Services Limited R&D The Connection Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | |||
03 /
Wong, Gavin c/o Vodafone Group Services Ltd. R&D The Connection Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | |||
Former [2011/06] | 01 /
Pudney, Christopher R&D Vodafone Group Services Limited The Connection Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | ||
02 /
Russell, Nick R&D Vodafone Group Services Limited The Connection Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | |||
03 /
Wong, Gavin c/o Vodafone Group Services Ltd. R&D The Connection Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | Representative(s) | Sneary, Adrian Bernard Vodafone Group plc Vodafone House The Connection Newbury Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | Sneary, Adrian Bernard Vodafone Group Services Limited Group Legal Vodafone House The Connection Newbury Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | ||
Former [2011/06] | Sneary, Adrian Bernard Vodafone Group Services Limited Group Legal Vodafone House The Connection Newbury Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | Application number, filing date | 10170721.4 | 23.07.2010 | [2011/06] | Priority number, date | GB20090012944 | 24.07.2009 Original published format: GB 0912944 | [2011/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2282561 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2282561 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/12 | [2011/06] | CPC: |
H04W4/12 (EP,US);
H04W4/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/06] | Title | German: | Mitteilungsversand in mobilen Telekommunikationsnetzwerken | [2011/06] | English: | Messaging in mobile telecommunications networks | [2011/06] | French: | Messagerie dans des réseaux de télécommunications mobiles | [2011/06] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 28.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.07.2010 | AL | 21.12.2011 | AT | 21.12.2011 | BE | 21.12.2011 | CY | 21.12.2011 | CZ | 21.12.2011 | DK | 21.12.2011 | EE | 21.12.2011 | FI | 21.12.2011 | HR | 21.12.2011 | LT | 21.12.2011 | LV | 21.12.2011 | MK | 21.12.2011 | MT | 21.12.2011 | NL | 21.12.2011 | PL | 21.12.2011 | RO | 21.12.2011 | SE | 21.12.2011 | SI | 21.12.2011 | SK | 21.12.2011 | SM | 21.12.2011 | TR | 21.12.2011 | BG | 21.03.2012 | NO | 21.03.2012 | GR | 22.03.2012 | IS | 21.04.2012 | PT | 23.04.2012 | IE | 23.07.2012 | LU | 23.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AL | 21.12.2011 | |
AT | 21.12.2011 | ||
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
MK | 21.12.2011 | ||
MT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
SM | 21.12.2011 | ||
TR | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
IE | 23.07.2012 | ||
LU | 23.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AL | 21.12.2011 | |
AT | 21.12.2011 | ||
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
MK | 21.12.2011 | ||
MT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
TR | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
IE | 23.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AL | 21.12.2011 | |
AT | 21.12.2011 | ||
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
MK | 21.12.2011 | ||
MT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
IE | 23.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
MK | 21.12.2011 | ||
MT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
IE | 23.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
MK | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
IE | 23.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
MK | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
MK | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/30] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 21.12.2011 | |
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 21.12.2011 | |
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 21.12.2011 | |
NO | 21.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009056932 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 1,2 * * page 4, line 11 - page 8, line 3 *; | [A] - VODAFONE, "Discussion on the technical aspects of Native SMS over LTE", 3GPP DRAFT; S2-094610 - DISC ON NATIVE SMS OVER LTE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090630), no. Sophia; 20090630, XP050356090 [A] 1-14 * paragraph 2.1 paragraph 2.1.1 paragraph 2.1.3.1 paragraph 2.2.1 * * figures 1,2 * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Study on Circuit Switched (CS) domain services over evolved Packet Switched (PS) access; Stage 2 (Release 9)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 23.879, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090301), no. V9.0.0, pages 1 - 60, XP050364079 [A] 1-14 * paragraph 5.2.2.9 paragraph 5.2.3 * |