EP2412391 - A breast pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.02.2013 [2013/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2012/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bosman, Franciscus, J / P.O. Box 220 5600 AE, Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Mulder, Bernardo, A / P.O. Box 220 5600 AE, Eindhoven / NL | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | Damen, Daniel Martijn Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | Damen, Daniel Martijn Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 10170866.7 | 27.07.2010 | [2012/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2412391 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00, A61M1/06 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
A61M1/06 (EP,US);
A61M1/0697 (EP,US);
A61M1/75 (EP,US);
A61M1/81 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Milchpumpe | [2012/05] | English: | A breast pump | [2012/05] | French: | Tire-lait | [2012/05] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/06] | 13.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2001038799 (SILVER BRIAN H [US], et al) [Y] 3-6,8,9,12,13* paragraphs [0080] - [0087]; figures 12-14 *; | [XY]WO2004058330 (MAMMA LACTANS AS [NO], et al) [X] 1,2,11,14,15 * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 30; figure 1 * [Y] 3-6,8,9,12,13 |