EP2295836 - Butterfly valve, preferably for a blow off circuit of a gas turbine plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ansaldo Energia S.p.A. Via Nicola Lorenzi 8 Genova / IT | [2011/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dotta, Claudio Via Teglia, 147 17044, S. MARTINO STELLA / IT | 02 /
Ferrari, Fabrizio Via Papa Giovanni XXIII, 77/1 16013, CAMPO LIGURE / IT | 03 /
Massalin, Luciano Via Anton Giulio Barrili, 1/12 16143, GENOVA / IT | [2011/11] | Representative(s) | Bergadano, Mirko, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2013/23] |
Former [2011/11] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 10171142.2 | 28.07.2010 | [2011/11] | Priority number, date | IT2009MI01345 | 29.07.2009 Original published format: IT MI20091345 | [2011/11] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2295836 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/226, F02D9/10 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
F02D9/1045 (EP,US);
F16K1/2263 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Klappventil, insbesondere für eine Ablassleitung einer Gasturbine | [2011/11] | English: | Butterfly valve, preferably for a blow off circuit of a gas turbine plant | [2011/11] | French: | Vanne à papillon, particulierement pour un circuit de échappement d'une turbine à gas | [2011/11] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/48] | 02.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 31.07.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1181609 (RIVALS) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [X]LU39860 (GROVE) [X] 1-9 * page 5 - page 10; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US3030066 (EDWARD SWAIN FRANK) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US3080145 (EDWARD SWAIN FRANK) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US3544066 (FAWKES DONALD G) [A] 1-9 * column 2, lines 54-62; figure - * |