EP2317434 - Apparatus to modify applications of mobile terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pantech Co., Ltd. Pantech R&D Center I-2, DMC Sangam-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-270 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | For all designated states Pantech Co., Ltd. Pantech R&D Center I-2, DMC Sangam-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-270 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, Dong-Hyuk Gwanak Dreamtown Apt., Seonghyeon-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 110-2002 / KR | [2012/34] |
Former [2011/18] | 01 /
Yang, Dong-Hyuk Gwanak Dreamtown Apt., Seonghyeon-dong, Gwanak-gu Seoul 110-2002 / KR | ||
02 /
Kang, Min-Su Hanjin Rosehill Apt., Ojeon-dong, Uiwang-si Gyeonggi-do 108-1304 / KR | |||
03 /
Kim Bo-Sun Ace Ville, 128-14beonji, Garak 2-dong, Songpa-gu Seoul 402ho / KR | |||
04 /
Kim, Young-Eun Huindol Seoan Apt., Baekseok-dong, Ilsandong-gu, Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do 509-306 / KR | |||
05 /
Jung Ho-Ryong Jeungsan-dong, Eunpyeong-gu Seoul 202-14ho / KR | |||
06 /
Cho, Hwang-Joo Woosung Apt., Sadang 2-dong, Dongjak-gu Seoul 305-708 / KR | |||
07 /
Choi, Jae-Young Woorim Rodeo Sweet, 771-1beonji, Janghang 2-dong, Ilsandong-gu Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do 1308ho / KR | |||
08 /
Ham, Yun-Sik Yeonnam-dong, Mapo-gu Seoul 226-34beonji / KR | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | Herzog, Markus, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10171681.9 | 03.08.2010 | [2011/18] | Priority number, date | KR20090082076 | 01.09.2009 Original published format: KR 20090082076 | [2011/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2317434 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2317434 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, G06F9/445 | [2011/18] | CPC: |
G06F9/453 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H04L67/535 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (KR);
H04M1/72448 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Modifizierung der Anwendungen eines mobilen Endgeräts | [2011/18] | English: | Apparatus to modify applications of mobile terminal | [2011/18] | French: | Appareil pour modifier les applications d'un terminal mobile | [2011/18] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2010 | Examination requested [2011/18] | 18.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/52] | 29.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003132970 (LEHMEIER MICHELLE R [US], et al) [A] 1-9,14* the whole document *; | [XI]US2003191730 (ADKINS BARRY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,14 * abstract * * claim 1 * * paragraphs [0018] , [0034] * * paragraphs [0017] , [0 20] , [0 23] , [0 48] , [0 64] * [I] 3-9 |