EP2258921 - Actuator for well-head valve or other similar applications and system incorporating same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/49] | Actuator for well-haed valve or other similar applications and system incorporating same | ||
[2011/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WOODWARD, INC. 1000 E. Drake Road Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | [2011/15] |
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states Woodward Governor Company 1000 E. Drake Road P.O. Box 1519 Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greeb, Kevin E. c/o Woodward Governor Company 1000 East Drake Road Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | 02 /
Stewart, Jeffery T. 32425 Weld County Road 43 Greeley, CO 80631 / US | 03 /
Sweer, Grant A. 521 Huntington Hills Drive Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | 04 /
Kleckler, Joel W. 11870 Rockton Avenue Rockton, IL 61072 / US | 05 /
Hybeck, Roger T. c/o Woodward Governor Company 1000 East Drake Road Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | [2012/52] |
Former [2010/49] | 01 /
Greeb, Kevin E. c/o Woodward Governor Company 1000 East Drake Road Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | ||
02 /
Stewart, Jeffery T. 32425 Weld County Road 43 Greeley, CO 80631 / US | |||
03 /
Sweer, Grant A. 521 Huntington Hills Drive Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | |||
04 /
Kleckler, Joel W. 11870 Rockton Avenue Rockton, IL 61072 / US | |||
05 /
Hybeck, Roger T. c/o Woodward Governor Company 1000 East Drake Road Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2010/49] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 10171742.9 | 08.01.2004 | [2010/49] | Priority number, date | US20030340017 | 10.01.2003 Original published format: US 340017 | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2258921 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2258921 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2258921 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E21B34/02, E21B34/16, E21B43/14, F16K31/04 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
E21B34/16 (EP,US);
E21B34/025 (EP,US);
F16K31/046 (EP,US);
F16K31/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | Stellglied für Bohrlochkopfventil oder andere ähnliche Anwendungen und dieses enthaltendes System | [2010/49] | English: | Actuator for well-head valve or other similar applications and system incorporating same | [2011/13] | French: | Actionneur pour vanne de tête de puits ou autres applications identiques et système comprenant ledit actionneur | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/49] | Actuator for well-haed valve or other similar applications and system incorporating same | Examination procedure | 07.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 26.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04700904.8 / EP1585885 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040700904) is 17.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.01.2004 | AT | 04.09.2013 | BE | 04.09.2013 | BG | 04.09.2013 | CY | 04.09.2013 | CZ | 04.09.2013 | DK | 04.09.2013 | EE | 04.09.2013 | ES | 04.09.2013 | FI | 04.09.2013 | MC | 04.09.2013 | NL | 04.09.2013 | RO | 04.09.2013 | SE | 04.09.2013 | SI | 04.09.2013 | SK | 04.09.2013 | TR | 04.09.2013 | GR | 05.12.2013 | PT | 06.01.2014 | IE | 08.01.2014 | LU | 08.01.2014 | CH | 31.01.2014 | FR | 31.01.2014 | LI | 31.01.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 08.01.2004 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
IE | 08.01.2014 | ||
LU | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
IE | 08.01.2014 | ||
LU | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
IE | 08.01.2014 | ||
LU | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
LU | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
LU | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
LU | 08.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
SE | 04.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3324741 (ANDERSON CLIFFORD E [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US4679764 (SMITH GORDON M [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]US4916617 (NORWOOD WILLIAM L [US]) [X] 1-7* the whole document *; | [XI]US2002066623 (POWROZEK BRYAN DANIEL [US]) [X] 8 * paragraphs [0030] , [ 0042] * [I] 9-15 | Examination | US4616528 | by applicant | US6161835 |