EP2298990 - Device for providing intermediate layers, paletting method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/12] | Device for providing intermediate layers, intermediate layer, paletting method | ||
[2012/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstraße 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dietersberger, Martin Eichenstr. 7 83135, Schechen/Pfaffenhofen / DE | 02 /
Perl, Kurt Zacking 9 83253, Rimsting / DE | [2012/38] |
Former [2011/12] | 01 /
Dietersberger, Martin Eichenstr. 7 83135, Schechen/Pfaffenhofen / DE | ||
02 /
Perl, Kurt Zacking 9 83253, Rimsting / DE | Representative(s) | Reichert, Werner Franz Reichert & Kollegen Bismarckplatz 8 93047 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | Reichert, Werner Franz Reichert & Kollegen Bismarckplatz 8 93047 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2011/12] | Reichert, Werner Franz Reichert & Kollegen Bismarckplatz 8 93047 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10172333.6 | 10.08.2010 | [2011/12] | Priority number, date | DE20091043877 | 27.08.2009 Original published format: DE102009043877 | [2011/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2298990 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2298990 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | D21H23/52, D21H27/00, B65G57/00 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
B65G57/005 (EP);
D21H23/52 (EP);
D21H27/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/12] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Bereitstellen von Zwischenlagen, Verfahren zum Palettieren | [2012/12] | English: | Device for providing intermediate layers, paletting method | [2012/12] | French: | Dispositif de préparation de couches intermédiaires, procédé de palettisation | [2012/12] |
Former [2011/12] | Einrichtung zum Bereitstellen von Zwischenlagen, Zwischenlage, Verfahren zum Palettieren | ||
Former [2011/12] | Device for providing intermediate layers, intermediate layer, paletting method | ||
Former [2011/12] | Dispositif de préparation de couches intermédiaires, couche intermédiaire, procédé de palettisation | Examination procedure | 11.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 30.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12170478.7 / EP2495365 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.08.2010 | AL | 19.09.2012 | CY | 19.09.2012 | CZ | 19.09.2012 | DK | 19.09.2012 | EE | 19.09.2012 | FI | 19.09.2012 | HR | 19.09.2012 | LT | 19.09.2012 | LV | 19.09.2012 | MC | 19.09.2012 | MK | 19.09.2012 | MT | 19.09.2012 | PL | 19.09.2012 | RO | 19.09.2012 | SE | 19.09.2012 | SK | 19.09.2012 | SM | 19.09.2012 | TR | 19.09.2012 | BG | 19.12.2012 | NO | 19.12.2012 | GR | 20.12.2012 | IS | 19.01.2013 | PT | 21.01.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 10.08.2010 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
MK | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
SM | 19.09.2012 | ||
TR | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
MK | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
SM | 19.09.2012 | ||
TR | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
SM | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CZ | 19.09.2012 | |
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CZ | 19.09.2012 | |
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CZ | 19.09.2012 | |
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CZ | 19.09.2012 | |
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/12] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 19.09.2012 | |
NO | 19.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0560112 (FOCKE & CO [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract *; | [AD]DE102005011696 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * Background *; | [AD]DE20209571U (MEURER FRANZ JOSEF [DE]) [AD] 1,11,14 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0560112 | EP0569520 | DE102005011696 | DE20209571U | DE102004021623 | EP0563480 | GB1205507 |