EP2371657 - Coupling head of an automatic middle buffer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schüler, Martin Berlinerstr. 98 42929 Wermelskirchen / DE | [2012/33] |
Former [2011/40] | 01 /
Schüler, Martin Berlinerstr. 98 42929, Wermelskirchen / DE | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Kay, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | Rupprecht, Kay, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/40] | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10172493.8 | 11.08.2010 | [2011/40] | Priority number, date | EP20100157092 | 19.03.2010 Original published format: EP 10157092 | [2011/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2371657 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2371657 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B61G3/10, B61G5/06 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
B61G3/10 (EP);
B61G5/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/40] | Title | German: | Kupplungskopf einer automatischen Mittelpufferkupplung | [2011/40] | English: | Coupling head of an automatic middle buffer | [2011/40] | French: | Tête d'accouplement d'un attelage central automatique | [2011/40] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 17.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 31.10.2012 | CY | 31.10.2012 | CZ | 31.10.2012 | DK | 31.10.2012 | HR | 31.10.2012 | IT | 31.10.2012 | LT | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | MK | 31.10.2012 | MT | 31.10.2012 | NL | 31.10.2012 | PL | 31.10.2012 | SI | 31.10.2012 | SK | 31.10.2012 | SM | 31.10.2012 | TR | 31.10.2012 | BG | 31.01.2013 | NO | 31.01.2013 | GR | 01.02.2013 | ES | 11.02.2013 | IS | 28.02.2013 | PT | 28.02.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
MK | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
SM | 31.10.2012 | ||
TR | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
SM | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/46] | CZ | 31.10.2012 | |
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 31.10.2012 | |
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 31.10.2012 | |
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | DK | 31.10.2012 | |
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | HR | 31.10.2012 | |
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | HR | 31.10.2012 | |
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | HR | 31.10.2012 | |
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | HR | 31.10.2012 | |
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | LT | 31.10.2012 | |
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 31.10.2012 | |
NO | 31.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1439832 (BOIRAULT APP, et al) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [A]CH425877 (WSESOJUZNYI NII SHELEZNODOROSH [RU]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, lines 6-114; figures 1-11 *; | [A]FR1484616 (BOIRAULT APP, et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE1455242 (MIDLAND ROSS CORP) [AD] 1* the whole document *; | [A]FR2101987 (KNORR BREMSE GMBH) [A] 1,6 * page 7; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | DE1455242 |