EP2420709 - Vacuum valve and locking link for gas-tight closing of a flow path using a linear movement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VAT Holding AG Seelistrasse 9469 Haag / CH | [2012/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geiser, Friedrich / Im Hag 12 A-6714, Nüziders / AT | 02 /
Neumeir, Anton / Sägeboden CH-9658, Wildhaus / CH | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | Harmann, Bernd-Günther Kaminski Harmann Patentanwälte AG Landstrasse 124 9490 Vaduz / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | Harmann, Bernd-Günther Kaminski Harmann Patentanwälte Est Austrasse 79 9490 Vaduz / LI | Application number, filing date | 10172891.3 | 16.08.2010 | [2012/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2420709 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16K3/314, F16K51/02 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
F16K51/02 (EP);
F16K3/314 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vakuumventil und Verschlussglied zum gasdichten Schliessen eines Fliesswegs mittels einer Linearbewegung | [2012/08] | English: | Vacuum valve and locking link for gas-tight closing of a flow path using a linear movement | [2012/08] | French: | Soupape à vide et articulation de fermeture pour la fermeture étanche au gaz d'une trajectoire d'écoulement à l'aide d'un déplacement linéaire | [2012/08] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/09] | 04.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4809950 (GEISER FRIEDRICH [AT]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]US4881717 (GEISER FRIEDRICH [AT]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US4921213 (GEISER FRIEDRICH [AT]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2003160204 (BLECHA THOMAS [AT]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | US4809950 | US4881717 | US6416037 | US6056266 | US6089537 | US6629682 | JPH06241344 |