EP2420333 - Tool and method for expanding a pipe end [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uponor Innovation AB P.O. Box 101 73061 Virsbo / SE | [2014/48] |
Former [2013/04] | For all designated states Uponor Innovation AB P.O. Box 101 73061 Virsbo / SE | ||
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Uponor Innovation Ab Virsbo Industriomräde 73061 Virsbo / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lundequist, Yngve Box 28 73061 Virsbo / SE | 02 /
Persson, Håkan Färnebo Ösby 141 73070 Västerfärnebo / SE | 03 /
Sundqvist, Erika Fraggvägen 21 73891 Norberg / SE | 04 /
Backlund, Johan Blomstergatan 2 72225 Västerås / SE | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | Papula Oy P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2013/30] |
Former [2012/08] | Huhtanen, Ossi Jaakko Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 10172913.5 | 16.08.2010 | [2012/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2420333 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2420333 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B21D41/02, B21D39/20, B29C57/04, F16L13/14 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
B21D39/20 (EP,US);
B29D23/001 (US);
B21D41/02 (EP,US);
B21D41/021 (US);
B29C57/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Title | German: | Werkzeug und Verfahren zur Aufweitung eines Rohrendes | [2012/08] | English: | Tool and method for expanding a pipe end | [2012/08] | French: | Outil et procédé d'elargissement de l'extrémité d'un tube | [2012/08] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/39] | 21.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.08.2010 | AL | 26.11.2014 | AT | 26.11.2014 | BE | 26.11.2014 | BG | 26.11.2014 | CY | 26.11.2014 | CZ | 26.11.2014 | HR | 26.11.2014 | IT | 26.11.2014 | LV | 26.11.2014 | MC | 26.11.2014 | MK | 26.11.2014 | MT | 26.11.2014 | RO | 26.11.2014 | SI | 26.11.2014 | SK | 26.11.2014 | SM | 26.11.2014 | TR | 26.11.2014 | GR | 27.02.2015 | IS | 26.03.2015 | LU | 16.08.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 16.08.2010 | |
AT | 26.11.2014 | ||
BE | 26.11.2014 | ||
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MK | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
SM | 26.11.2014 | ||
TR | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
LU | 16.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/46] | HU | 16.08.2010 | |
AT | 26.11.2014 | ||
BE | 26.11.2014 | ||
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
SM | 26.11.2014 | ||
TR | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
LU | 16.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 16.08.2010 | |
AT | 26.11.2014 | ||
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
SM | 26.11.2014 | ||
TR | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
LU | 16.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
LU | 16.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
LU | 16.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
LU | 16.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | HR | 26.11.2014 | |
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | IS | 26.03.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0682758 (WIRSBO BRUKS AB [SE]) [AD] 1-10* the whole document *; | [AD]EP1118401 (VIRAX SA [FR]) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XA]US2008196468 (TANNER PAUL A [CA], et al) [X] 1,6,9,10 * the whole document * [A] 2-5,7,8; | [XAI]EP2090385 (NOVOPRESS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,7-10 * figures 7-12 * [A] 3-5 [I] 6 | by applicant | EP0417674 | WO9510000 | EP0682758 | EP1118401 | WO2009000966 |