EP2250896 - Synergistic herbicidal agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/46] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hacker, Erwin Margarethenstraße 16 65239, Hochheim / DE | 02 /
Bieringer, Hermann Eichenweg 26 65817, Eppstein / DE | 03 /
Krähmer, Hansjörg Kantstraße 20 65719, Hofheim / DE | [2013/05] |
Former [2010/46] | 01 /
Hacker, Erwin Margarethenstraße 16 65239, Hochheim / DE | ||
02 /
Bieringer, Hermann Eichenweg 26 65817, Eppstein / DE | |||
03 /
Krähmer, Hansjörg Kantstraße 20 65719, Hofheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 10173014.1 | 25.11.2002 | [2010/46] | Priority number, date | DE2001160139 | 07.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10160139 | [2010/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2250896 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2250896 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | [2011/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2250896 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01N41/10, A01N43/80, A01P13/02, // A01N25/32 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
A01N41/10 (EP,KR,US);
A01N35/06 (KR);
A01N37/34 (KR)
| C-Set: |
A01N41/10, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N41/10, A01N47/36, A01N43/70, A01N37/40, A01N25/32 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2010/46] | Extension states | RO | 27.10.2011 | SI | 27.10.2011 | Title | German: | Synergistische herbizide Mittel | [2010/46] | English: | Synergistic herbicidal agents | [2010/46] | French: | Agents herbicides synergiques | [2010/46] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/49] | 06.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02787803.2 / EP1455578 | EP09012741.6 / EP2140763 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020787803) is 10.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.01.2013 | DK | 30.01.2013 | EE | 30.01.2013 | FI | 30.01.2013 | MC | 30.01.2013 | SE | 30.01.2013 | [2014/33] |
Former [2013/52] | CY | 30.01.2013 | |
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | DK | 30.01.2013 | |
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 30.01.2013 | |
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 30.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2781983 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-6* page 1 - page 2; tables 2,3 *; | [AD]WO0128341 (AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-6 * page 1 - page 2 * * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 3 * * page 15 - page 16, paragraph 2 * * page 20, paragraph 2 * * page 25 - page 26, paragraph 1; example B.VIII * | by applicant | EP0635996 | WO9507897 | WO9829406 | WO0021924 | WO0128341 | - S. R. COLBY, WEEDS, (1967), vol. 15, pages 20 - 22 |