EP2292493 - Handle lock structure for working machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okabe, Kaku c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2011/49] |
Former [2011/10] | 01 /
Okabe, Kaku c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | Prechtel, Jörg Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/10] | Prechtel, Jörg Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10173061.2 | 17.08.2010 | [2011/10] | Priority number, date | JP20090204772 | 04.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009204772 | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2292493 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2292493 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B62B1/00, B62B5/06, F02B63/02 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
B62B5/067 (EP,US);
B62B1/00 (EP,US);
B62B2205/20 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5774 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/10] | Title | German: | Griffsperrstruktur für eine Arbeitsmaschine | [2011/10] | English: | Handle lock structure for working machine | [2011/10] | French: | Structure de verrou de poignée pour machine de travail | [2011/10] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2010 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 22.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.08.2010 | AL | 07.12.2011 | AT | 07.12.2011 | BE | 07.12.2011 | CY | 07.12.2011 | CZ | 07.12.2011 | DK | 07.12.2011 | EE | 07.12.2011 | FI | 07.12.2011 | HR | 07.12.2011 | LT | 07.12.2011 | LV | 07.12.2011 | MK | 07.12.2011 | MT | 07.12.2011 | NL | 07.12.2011 | PL | 07.12.2011 | RO | 07.12.2011 | SE | 07.12.2011 | SI | 07.12.2011 | SK | 07.12.2011 | SM | 07.12.2011 | TR | 07.12.2011 | BG | 07.03.2012 | NO | 07.03.2012 | GR | 08.03.2012 | IS | 07.04.2012 | PT | 09.04.2012 | IE | 17.08.2012 | LU | 17.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 17.08.2010 | |
AL | 07.12.2011 | ||
AT | 07.12.2011 | ||
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
SM | 07.12.2011 | ||
TR | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
IE | 17.08.2012 | ||
LU | 17.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AL | 07.12.2011 | |
AT | 07.12.2011 | ||
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
SM | 07.12.2011 | ||
TR | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
IE | 17.08.2012 | ||
LU | 17.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AL | 07.12.2011 | |
AT | 07.12.2011 | ||
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
TR | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
IE | 17.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AL | 07.12.2011 | |
AT | 07.12.2011 | ||
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
IE | 17.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
IE | 17.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/30] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 07.12.2011 | |
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 07.12.2011 | |
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 07.12.2011 | |
NO | 07.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5709400 (BONNIER MICHEL [FR], et al) [A] 4* figure 3 *; | [A]EP1645485 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0082]; figure 15 *; | [XI]DE202005019979U (KAERCHER GMBH & CO KG ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [I] 4-6; | [XI]JP2008024278 (YOSHIZAKI TAKAYUKI) [X] 1,3 * abstract * [I] 4-6 | by applicant | JP4226404B |