EP2420450 - Apparatus for filling a product into a container under aseptic conditions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aseptic Technologies Rue Camille Hubert, 7-9 5032 Gembloux-Les Isnes / BE | [2012/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thilly, Jacques c/o ASEPTIC TECHNOLOGIES Rue Camille Hubert, 7-9 5032 Gembloux / BE | 02 /
Baleriaux, Patrick c/o ASEPTIC TECHNOLOGIES Rue Camille Hubert, 7-9 5032 Gembloux / BE | 03 /
Marechal, Julien c/o ASEPTIC TECHNOLOGIES Rue Camille Hubert, 7-9 5032 Gembloux / BE | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | Van Reet, Joseph, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [2012/08] | Application number, filing date | 10173102.4 | 17.08.2010 | [2012/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2420450 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65B55/02 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
B65B3/003 (EP);
B65B3/28 (EP);
B65B43/52 (EP);
B65B55/025 (EP);
B65B55/027 (EP);
F26B15/04 (EP);
B08B15/02 (EP);
B65B2210/06 (EP);
B65B31/027 (EP);
F26B5/06 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Einfüllen eines Produkts in einen Behälter unter aseptischen Bedingungen | [2012/08] | English: | Apparatus for filling a product into a container under aseptic conditions | [2012/08] | French: | Appareil de remplissage d'un produit dans un conteneur dans des conditions aseptiques | [2012/08] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/07] | 28.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1647488 (MARCHESINI GROUP SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-9,11-13 * column 29 - column 45 * * column 55 - column 72 *; | [Y]EP0565166 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [Y] 1-4,6,11 * column 3, line 51 - column 5, line 35 *; | [Y]WO2005093433 (BECKMAN COULTER INC [US]) [Y] 7-9 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0037] *; | [Y]GB1161250 (DOLE ENG CO JAMES [US]) [Y] 5 * page 1, line 23 - page 1, line 42 *; | [Y]WO2009153018 (VETTER & CO APOTHEKER [DE], et al) [Y] 12 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2004076288 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE BIOLOG SA [BE], et al) [Y] 13 * page 2, line 1 - page 6, line 12 * * page 13, line 1 - page 19, line 13 * | by applicant | WO2004076288 | WO2003EP09151 |