EP2261333 - Pharmaceutical composition comprising anti-miRNA antisense oligonucleotides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Innovation Center Copenhagen A/S Fremtidsvej 3 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [2015/50] |
Former [2013/40] | For all designated states Stella ApS Fremtidsvej 3 2970 Hørsholm / DK | ||
Former [2013/03] | For all designated states Santaris Pharma A/S Fremtidsvej 3 2970 Hørsholm / DK | ||
Former [2010/50] | For all designated states Santaris Pharma A/S Kogle Allé 6 2970 Hørsholm / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Elmén, Joacim Sickla Kanalgata 19 A 120 67 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
Kearney, Phil 2 Wild Street Picton New South Wales 2571 / AU | 03 /
Kauppinen, Sakari Norskekrogen 12 2765 Smoerum / DK | [2011/40] |
Former [2010/50] | 01 /
Elmén, Joacim Föreningsgaten 61 211 52 Malmoe / SE | ||
02 /
Kearney, Phil 2 Wild Street Picton New South Wales 2571 / AU | |||
03 /
Kauppinen, Sakari Norskekrogen 12 2765 Smoerum / DK | Representative(s) | Turner, Mark Frederic Paris, et al Santaris Pharma A/S Fremtidsvej 3 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [2013/33] |
Former [2010/50] | Turner, Mark Frederic Paris Santaris Pharma A/S Kogle Allé 6 2970 Hørsholm / DK | Application number, filing date | 10173208.9 | 30.03.2007 | [2010/50] | Priority number, date | DK20060000478 | 03.04.2006 Original published format: DK 200600478 | US20060788995P | 03.04.2006 Original published format: US 788995 P | DK20060000615 | 01.05.2006 Original published format: DK 200600615 | US20060796813P | 01.05.2006 Original published format: US 796813 P | US20060838710P | 18.08.2006 Original published format: US 838710 P | DK20060001401 | 30.10.2006 Original published format: DK 200601401 | [2010/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2261333 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2261333 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2261333 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K31/712, C07H21/00, // A61P3/06, A61P3/10, A61P31/14, A61P35/00, A61P9/10 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C12N2310/113 (EP,US);
C12N2310/321 (EP,US);
C12N2310/322 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3521 (EP,US);
C12N2310/322, C12N2310/3533 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/13] |
Former [2010/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung mit Anti-miRNA-Antisense-Oligonukleotiden | [2010/50] | English: | Pharmaceutical composition comprising anti-miRNA antisense oligonucleotides | [2010/50] | French: | Composition pharmaceutique comprenant des oligonucléotides antisens anti-ARNmi | [2010/50] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 03.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07722548.0 / EP2007888 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.03.2007 | AT | 30.03.2016 | BE | 30.03.2016 | BG | 30.03.2016 | CY | 30.03.2016 | CZ | 30.03.2016 | DK | 30.03.2016 | EE | 30.03.2016 | FI | 30.03.2016 | IE | 30.03.2016 | LT | 30.03.2016 | LU | 30.03.2016 | LV | 30.03.2016 | MC | 30.03.2016 | NL | 30.03.2016 | PL | 30.03.2016 | RO | 30.03.2016 | SE | 30.03.2016 | SI | 30.03.2016 | SK | 30.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | GR | 01.07.2016 | IS | 30.07.2016 | PT | 01.08.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 30.03.2007 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IE | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LU | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.03.2007 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IE | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MT | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IE | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MT | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IE | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MT | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IE | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IE | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 30.03.2016 | |
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
GR | 01.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005013901 (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 11 - page 13 * * page 41 - page 43 * * page 23, line 17 - line 27 * * page 75 - page 89 * * page 120; sequence 30 * * pages 131,134; sequences 214,313 *; | [A]WO2005061710 (SANTARIS PHARMA AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - KRÜTZFELD, J. ET AL., "Silencing of microRNAs in vivo with 'antagomirs'.", NATURE, (200512), vol. 438, no. 7068, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 685 - 689, XP002376647 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature04303 | [A] - JOPLING C ET AL., "Modulation of hepatitis C virus RNA abundance by a liver-specific microRNA", SCIENCE, (200509), vol. 309, no. 5740, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1577 - 1581, XP009109384 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1113329 | [A] - JEPSEN JAN STENVANG ET AL, "Locked nucleic acid: A potent nucleic acid analog in therapeutics and biotechnology", OLIGONUCLEOTIDES, (2004), vol. 14, no. 2, ISSN 1545-4576, pages 130 - 146, XP002395137 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/1545457041526317 | [A] - BRENNECKE JULIUS ET AL, "Principles of microRNA-target recognition.", PLOS BIOLOGY, (200503), vol. 3, no. 3, ISSN 1545-7885, pages E85/0404 - E85/0418, XP002395136 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pbio.0030085 | by applicant | WO9914226 | WO0056746 | WO0056748 | WO0125248 | WO0228875 | EP1222309 | WO03006475 | WO03029459 | WO03095467 | US2005182005 | US2005227934 | WO2005098029 | US2005261218 | WO2006069584 | - BOUTLA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 31, pages 4973 - 4980 | - CHAN ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2005), vol. 65, no. 14, pages 6029 - 6033 | - LECELLIER ET AL., SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 308, pages 557 - 560 | - NAGUIBNEVA ET AL., NATURE CELL BIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 278 - 84 | - DASS CR, J PHARM PHARMACOL, (2002), vol. 54, no. 1, pages 3 - 27 | - D. S. PEDERSEN; C. ROSENBOHM; T. KOCH, "Preparation of LNA Phosphoramidites", SYNTHESIS, (2002), vol. 6, pages 802 - 808 | - HUTTON, NAR, (1977), vol. 4, no. 10, pages 3537 - 3555 | - DR. B. JANSEN, "Section of experimental Oncology, Molecular Pharmacology", DEPARTMENT OF CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY | - HEID ET AL., "Real time quantitative PCR", GENOME RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 6, pages 986 - 994 | - CHAN ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2005), vol. 65, no. 14, page 6029 | - IORIO ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2005), vol. 65, no. 16, page 7065 | - ABELSON, J.F. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 310, pages 317 - 20 | - BARTEL, D.P., CELL, (2004), vol. 116, pages 281 - 297 | - BOEHM, M.; SLACK, F., SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 310, pages 1954 - 7 | - BRENNECKE, J. ET AL., CELL, (2003), vol. 113, pages 25 - 36 | - CALIN, G.A. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 15524 - 15529 | - CALIN, G. A. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI.U.S.A., (2004), vol. 101, pages 2999 - 3004 | - CALIN, G.A. ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (2005), vol. 353, pages 1793 - 801 | - CHAN, J.A. ET AL., CANCER RES., (2005), vol. 65, pages 6029 - 33 | - CHEN, C.Z. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 303, pages 83 - 86 | - EIS, P.S. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (2005), vol. 102, pages 3627 - 32 | - GIRALDEZ, A.J. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 308, pages 833 - 838 | - GRIFFITHS-JONES, S. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2004), vol. 32, pages D109 - D111 | - GRIFFITHS-JONES, S. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2006), vol. 34, pages D140 - 4 | - HE, L. ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 435, pages 828 - 833 | - HORNSTEIN, E. ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 438, pages 671 - 4 | - HUTVAGNER, G. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 293, pages 834 - 838 | - HUTVÁGNER, G. ET AL., PLOS BIOLOGY, (2004), vol. 2, pages 1 - 11 | - IORIO, M.V. ET AL., CANCER RES., (2005), vol. 65, pages 7065 - 70 | - JIN, P. ET AL., NAT CELL BIOL., (2004), vol. 6, pages 1048 - 53 | - JOHNSON, S.M. ET AL., CELL, (2005), vol. 120, pages 635 - 647 | - JOPLING, C.L. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 309, pages 1577 - 81 | - KETTING, R.F. ET AL., GENES DEV., (2001), vol. 15, pages 2654 - 2659 | - KWON, C. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (2005), vol. 102, pages 18986 - 91 | - LANDTHALER, M. ET AL., CURR. BIOL., (2004), vol. 14, pages 2162 - 2167 | - LEAMAN, D. ET AL., CELL, (2005), vol. 121, pages 1097 - 108 | - LEE, Y. ET AL., NATURE, (2003), vol. 425, pages 415 - 419 | - LI, X.; CARTHEW, R.W., CELL, (2005), vol. 123, pages 1267 - 77 | - LU. J. ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 435, pages 834 - 838 | - MICHAEL, M.Z. ET AL., MOL. CANCER RES., (2003), vol. 1, pages 882 - 891 | - NELSON, P. ET AL., TIBS, (2003), vol. 28, pages 534 - 540 | - PAUSHKIN, S. ET AL., CURR.OPIN.CELL BIOL., (2002), vol. 14, pages 305 - 312 | - POY, M.N. ET AL., NATURE, (2004), vol. 432, pages 226 - 230 | - WIENHOLDS, E. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 309, pages 310 - 311 | - YEKTA, S. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 304, pages 594 - 596 | - ZHAO, Y. ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 436, pages 214 - 220 |