EP2299069 - Compact switchable hydraulic lash adjuster with hydraulic lost motion assist [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hendriksma, Nick John / 2939 Burrwick Drive Southeast Grand Rapids, MI 49546 / US | [2012/13] |
Former [2011/12] | 01 /
Hendriksma, Nick John 2939 Burrwick Drive Southeast Grand Rapids, MI 49546 / US | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Denton, Michael John Delphi France SAS Legal Staff 64, avenue de la Plaine de France BP 65059 Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2011/12] | Denton, Michael John Delphi France SAS Legal Staff 64, avenue de la Plaine de France BP 65059 Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10173788.0 | 24.08.2010 | [2011/12] | Priority number, date | US20090552737 | 02.09.2009 Original published format: US 552737 | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2299069 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2299069 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/14, F01L13/00 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
F01L13/0005 (EP,US);
F01L1/14 (EP,US);
F01L1/143 (EP,US);
F01L1/146 (EP,US);
F01L1/2405 (EP,US);
F01L2001/34446 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/12] | Title | German: | Kompaktes, umschaltbares, hydraulisches Ventilspielausgleichselement mit hydraulischer Leerlaufunterstützung | [2011/12] | English: | Compact switchable hydraulic lash adjuster with hydraulic lost motion assist | [2011/12] | French: | Dispositif hydraulique compact commutable de rattrapage de jeu de soupape avec aide hydraulique de course mort | [2011/12] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 04.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.08.2010 | AL | 28.03.2012 | AT | 28.03.2012 | BE | 28.03.2012 | CY | 28.03.2012 | CZ | 28.03.2012 | DK | 28.03.2012 | EE | 28.03.2012 | FI | 28.03.2012 | HR | 28.03.2012 | IT | 28.03.2012 | LT | 28.03.2012 | LV | 28.03.2012 | MK | 28.03.2012 | MT | 28.03.2012 | NL | 28.03.2012 | PL | 28.03.2012 | RO | 28.03.2012 | SE | 28.03.2012 | SI | 28.03.2012 | SK | 28.03.2012 | SM | 28.03.2012 | TR | 28.03.2012 | BG | 28.06.2012 | NO | 28.06.2012 | GR | 29.06.2012 | ES | 09.07.2012 | IS | 28.07.2012 | PT | 30.07.2012 | IE | 24.08.2012 | LU | 24.08.2012 | FR | 31.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 24.08.2010 | |
AL | 28.03.2012 | ||
AT | 28.03.2012 | ||
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
SM | 28.03.2012 | ||
TR | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
IE | 24.08.2012 | ||
LU | 24.08.2012 | ||
FR | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AL | 28.03.2012 | |
AT | 28.03.2012 | ||
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
SM | 28.03.2012 | ||
TR | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
IE | 24.08.2012 | ||
LU | 24.08.2012 | ||
FR | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AL | 28.03.2012 | |
AT | 28.03.2012 | ||
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
TR | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
IE | 24.08.2012 | ||
FR | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AL | 28.03.2012 | |
AT | 28.03.2012 | ||
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
IE | 24.08.2012 | ||
FR | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
IE | 24.08.2012 | ||
FR | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
IE | 24.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 28.03.2012 | |
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 28.03.2012 | |
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 28.03.2012 | |
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 28.03.2012 | |
NO | 28.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS63201306 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure - * [A] 2,8,9; | [A]DE4111610 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,8-10 * column 1, line 3 - line 6 * * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 1 ** figure - *; | [A]US6196175 (CHURCH KYNAN L [US]) [A] 1,3 * column 1, line 18 - line 20 * * column 4, line 29 - line 40 * * column 5, line 58 - line 67 *; | [A]GB2402708 (MA THOMAS TSOI HEI [GB]) [A] 1,8-12 * page 1, line 5 - line 7 * * page 5, line 8 - line 35 *; | [A]US2006118074 (HAEFNER DONALD R [US]) [A] 1,3,6,8,12 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0023] *; | [IP]DE102008054011 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [IP] 1,2 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0019] * * Ball 17 closes the reservoir 12 what can be seen as the claimed locking mechanism of line 10 in claim 1, as this disables the axial translation. * |