EP2290842 - Service providing system and method in a satellite communication system by allocating resources and power to hierarchical antenna multi beams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute 161 Gajeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-700 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute 161 Gajeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-700 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Hee-Wok 110-201, Jangdae Prugio Apt., Jangdae-dong, Yuseong-gu 305-308, Daejeon / KR | 02 /
Kang, Kunseok 201, 126-15, Sinseong-dong, Yuseong-gu 305-804, Daejeon / KR | 03 /
Ahn, Do-Seob 403-704 Expo Apt., Jeonmin-dong, Yuseong-gu 305-762, Daejeon / KR | 04 /
Lee, Ho-Jin 212-801 Expo Apt., Jeonmin-dong, Yuseong-gu 305-761, Daejeon / KR | [2011/09] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10174136.1 | 26.08.2010 | [2011/09] | Priority number, date | KR20090079759 | 27.08.2009 Original published format: KR 20090079759 | KR20100052257 | 03.06.2010 Original published format: KR 20100052257 | [2011/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2290842 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2290842 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
H04B7/18567 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anordnung und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung von Diensten in einem Satellitenkommunikationssystem durch Zuteilung von Mittel und Leistung an mehrere hierarchische Strahlen einer Antenne | [2011/09] | English: | Service providing system and method in a satellite communication system by allocating resources and power to hierarchical antenna multi beams | [2011/09] | French: | Système et méthode fournissant des services dans un système de communication par satellite par allocation de ressources et de puissance à des pinceaux d'antenne multiples et hiérarchisés | [2011/09] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 14.08.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6055431 (DYBDAL ROBERT B [US]) [X] 1-4,8 * figure 2 * * column 9, line 8 - line 30 * * column 10, line 40 - line 59 * * column 12, line 24 - line 28 * * column 12, line 32 - line 62 *; | [A]GB2318947 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]WO0113543 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * figure 7 * * abstract * * page 13, line 1 - line 7 * * page 15, line 3 - line 8 * * page 15, line 29 - line 32 *; | [A]WO0141531 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * |