EP2275130 - PCV2 ORF2 immunogenic composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM VETMEDICA, INC. 2621 North Belt Highway St. Joseph MO 64506-2002 / US | [2011/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roof, Michael B. BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM VETMEDICA, INC. 2621 North Belt Highway St. Joseph, MO 64506-2002 / US | 02 /
Eichmeyer, Marc Allan BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM VETMEDICA, INC. 2621 North Belt Highway St. Joseph, MO 64506-2002 / US | 03 /
Nitzel, Greg BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM VETMEDICA, INC. 2621 North Belt Highway St. Joseph, MO 64506-2002 / US | 04 /
Hayes, Phillip Wayne BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM VETMEDICA, INC. 2621 North Belt highway St. Joseph, MO 64506-2002 / US | 05 /
Schaeffer, Merrill Lynn BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM VETMEDICA, INC. 2621 North Belt highway St. Joseph, MO 64506-2002 / US | [2011/03] | Representative(s) | Hammann, Heinz, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/03] | Hammann, Heinz, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 10174456.3 | 28.12.2006 | [2011/03] | Priority number, date | US20050755016P | 29.12.2005 Original published format: US 755016 P | US20060829809P | 17.10.2006 Original published format: US 829809 P | [2011/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2275130 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2275130 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/12 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
A61K39/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/125 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
C12N7/00 (US);
A61K2039/5252 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5256 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5258 (EP,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,US);
A61K2039/552 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55516 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55555 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55566 (EP,US);
C12N2750/10022 (US);
C12N2750/10023 (EP,US);
C12N2750/10034 (EP,US);
C12N2750/10051 (EP,US);
C12N2750/10071 (US);
C12N2750/14143 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/03] | Title | German: | PCV2 ORF2 immunogenische Zusammensetzung | [2011/03] | English: | PCV2 ORF2 immunogenic composition | [2011/03] | French: | Composé immunofène de PCV2 ORF2 | [2011/03] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 24.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/12] | 03.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2012/12] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06850366.3 / EP1976558 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060850366) is 24.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2006072065 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM VETMED [US], et al) [XP] 1-3,5,6,8-11,13-16 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2007028823 (INTERVET INT BV [NL], et al) [E] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [XI] - BLANCHARD P ET AL, "Protection of swine against post-weaning multisystemic wasting syndrome (PMWS) by porcine circovirus type 2 (PCV2) proteins", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, (20031107), vol. 21, no. 31, doi:10.1016/S0264-410X(03)00503-6, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 4565 - 4575, XP004467337 [X] 1-3,8-11,13-16 * the whole document * [I] 4-7,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(03)00503-6 | [T] - FACHINGER ET AL, "The effect of vaccination against porcine circovirus type 2 in pigs suffering from porcine respiratory disease complex", VACCINE, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC. GUILDFORD, GB, (20080301), vol. 26, no. 11, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 1488 - 1499, XP022505432 [T] * the whole document * | [T] - KIXMOLLER M ET AL, "Reduction of PMWS-associated clinical signs and co-infections by vaccination against PCV2", VACCINE, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC. GUILDFORD, GB, vol. 26, no. 27-28, ISSN 0264-410X, (20080625), pages 3443 - 3451, (20080505), XP022710551 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2008.04.032 | by applicant | US6703023 | US4708871 | US2909462 | - GLENN E. MORRIS,, Epitope Mapping Protocols in Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, (1996), vol. 66 | - GEYSEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 3998 - 4002 | - GEYSEN ET AL., MOLEC. IMMUNOL., (1986), vol. 23, pages 709 - 715 | - BERGMANN ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 23, pages 2777 - 2781 | - BERGMANN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 157, pages 3242 - 3249 | - SUHRBIER, A., IMMUNOL. AND CELL BIOL., (1997), vol. 75, pages 402 - 408 | - CARILLO, H.; LIPMAN, D., SIAM J. APPLIED MATH., (1988), vol. 48, page 1073 | - DEVEREUX, J. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1984), vol. 12, no. 1, page 387 | - ALTSCHUL, S. F. ET AL., J. MOLEC. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - HUNTER ET AL., The Theory and Practical Application of Adjuvants, JOHNWILEY AND SONS, (1995), pages 51 - 94 | - TODD ET AL., VACCINE, (1997), vol. 15, pages 564 - 570 | - PHAMEUROPA, (199606), vol. 8, no. 2 | US20050034797 |