EP2423595 - Method and device for ascertaining the approach of the lean blow off of a gas turbine engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | For all designated states Alstom Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stankovic, Dragan / Feldstrasse 7 5415, Nussbaumen / CH | 02 /
De La Cruz Garcia, Marta / Sumatrastrasse 1 8006, Zürich / CH | 03 /
Genin, Franklin Marie / Oberdorfstrasse 4 5415, Nussbaumen / CH | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/09] | Application number, filing date | 10174540.4 | 30.08.2010 | [2012/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2423595 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F23N5/24 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
F23N5/242 (EP,US);
F23N2241/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Ermittlung des Ansatzes von Schwachgasen aus einem Gasturbinenmotor | [2012/09] | English: | Method and device for ascertaining the approach of the lean blow off of a gas turbine engine | [2012/09] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour detecter l'approche de conditions limites d'une extinction pauvre d'un moteur à turbine à gaz | [2012/09] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/11] | 08.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010076698 (HE CHENGLI [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0064] , [ 0073] *; | [X]US6026644 (ITO KAZUYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7-10 * column 7, line 14 - column 19, line 28; figures 1,18,21,22 *; | [A]US2002033014 (ENDO TOMOYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5878566 (ENDO TOMOYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |