EP2272966 - Sugar and lipid metabolism regulators in plants IV [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Plant Science GmbH 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2011/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oswald, Oliver Nibelungenstrasse 158 64686 Lautertal / DE | 02 /
Bauer, Jörg Maxburgstrasse 6 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 03 /
Mittendorf, Volker 1 Winnawa Walk Hillsborough, NC 27278 / US | 04 /
Härtel, Heiko A. Hansastrasse 131 13088 Berlin / DE | [2011/02] | Representative(s) | Popp, Andreas BASF SE GVX/B - C 6 Carl-Bosch-Str. 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | Popp, Andreas BASF SE GVX/B - C 6 Carl-Bosch-Str. 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10174677.4 | 04.08.2003 | [2011/02] | Priority number, date | US20020400803P | 02.08.2002 Original published format: US 400803 P | [2011/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2272966 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2272966 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, A01H5/00, C12N15/29 | [2011/02] | CPC: |
C12N15/8247 (EP,US);
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
C12N15/8243 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/02] | Title | German: | Zucker- und Lipidmetabolismusregulierer in Pflanzen IV | [2011/02] | English: | Sugar and lipid metabolism regulators in plants IV | [2011/02] | French: | Régulateurs du métabolisme lipidique et du sucre dans les plantes IV | [2011/02] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 12.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 27.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/32] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03767156.7 / EP1534843 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030767156) is 27.09.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0210210 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [X] 3 * the whole document * * SEQID1334 exhibits 100% identity in 391 amino acids to SEQID26 * [I] 1,2,4,5; | [A]WO0138484 (BASF PLANT SCIENCE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9845461 (RHONE POULENC AGROCHIMIE [FR], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9119806 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 30, line 10 - line 20 *; | [A]WO0135725 (MENDEL BIOTECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 8 *; | [A]WO9941974 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9835044 (CA NAT RESEARCH COUNCIL [CA], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [X] - YAMADA K., LIU S.X., ET AL., ""Arabidopsis Full Length cDNA Clones" -Arabidopsis thaliana putative phosphatidate cytidylyltransferase", EMBL SEQUENCE LIBRARY, ebi, Hinxton, (20010827), Database accession no. AY050778, URL: EBI, HINXTON, XP002413598 [X] 1-3 * abstract * * exhibits 100% identity in 1176 base pairs to SEQID25 (invention 13) * | [ ] - YAMADA,K., LIU,S.X., ET AL., "Arabidopsis thaliana (Mouse-ear cress)", TREML SEQUENCE DATABASE, ebi, Hinxton, (20011201), Database accession no. Q94A03, URL: EBI.HINXTON [ ] * abstract * | [AD] - OGAS J ET AL, "PICKLE IS A CHD3 CHROMATIN-REMODELING FACTOR THAT REGULATES THE TRANSITION FROM EMBRYONIC TO VEGETATIVE DEVELOPMENT IN ARABIDOPSIS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19991123), vol. 96, no. 24, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 13839 - 13844, XP002938317 [AD] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.24.13839 | [AD] - OGAS J ET AL, "Cellular differentiation regulated by gibberellin in the Arabidopsis thaliana pickle mutant", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (19970704), vol. 277, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 91 - 94, XP002120890 [AD] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.277.5322.91 | [A] - GIRKE T ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION OF A NOVEL DELTA6-ACYL-GROUP DESATURASE BY TARGETED GENE DISRUPTION IN PHYSCOMITRELLA PATENS", PLANT JOURNAL, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, OXFORD, GB, (1998), vol. 15, no. 1, ISSN 0960-7412, pages 39 - 48, XP000881712 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-313X.1998.00178.x | [A] - THOMA ET AL, "tissue-specific expression of a gene encoding a cell wall-localized lipid transfer protein from Arabidopsis", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, US, (1994), vol. 105, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 35 - 45, XP002094417 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.105.1.35 | by applicant | US5955650 | US6084164 | US4987071 | US5116742 | WO9801572 | US5352605 | WO8402913 | US4962028 | US5608152 | WO9845461 | US5504200 | WO9113980 | WO9515389 | WO9523230 | WO9916890 | WO9519443 | WO9321334 | US5187267 | WO9612814 | EP0375091 | WO9516783 | WO9706250 | WO9946394 | EP0424047 | US5322783 | EP0397687 | US5376543 | US5169770 | US6004804 | - TOPFER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 268, pages 681 - 686 | - CAHOON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 11184 - 11188 | - VAN DE LOO F.J. ET AL., Unusual Fatty Acids in Lipid Metabolism in Plants, CRC PRESS, (1993), pages 91 - 126 | - MILLAR ET AL., TRENDS PLANT SCI., (2000), vol. 5, pages 95 - 101 | - BROWSE ET AL., BIOCHEMICAL J., (1986), vol. 235, pages 25 - 31 | - OHLROGGE; BROWSE, PLANT CELL, (1995), vol. 7, pages 957 - 970 | - VOELKER, Genetic Engineering, (1996), vol. 18, pages 111 - 113 | - SHANKLIN; CAHOON, ANNU. REV. PLANT PHYSIOL. PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 49, pages 611 - 641 | - FRENTZEN, LIPIDS, (1998), vol. 100, pages 161 - 166 | - PLAXTON, ANNU. REV. PLANT PHYSIOL. PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 47, pages 185 - 214 | - KANG; RAWSTHOME, PLANT J., (1994), vol. 6, pages 795 - 805 | - VAN DE LOO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 6743 - 6747 | - CAHOON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 11184 - 11188 | - BRENNER, ADV. EXP. MED. BIOL., (1976), vol. 83, pages 85 - 101 | - RITCHIE; GILROY, PLANT PHYSIOL., (1998), vol. 116, pages 765 - 776 | - ARENAS-HUERTERO ET AL., GENES DEV., (2000), vol. 14, pages 2085 - 2096 | - KUO ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1996), vol. 8, pages 259 - 269 | - COHEN, TRENDS BIOCHEM. SCI., (1992), vol. 17, pages 408 - 413 | - ZHOU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 10294 - 10299 | - BEAUDOIN ET AL., PLANT CELL, (2000), pages 1103 - 1115 | - COLON-CARMONA ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (2000), vol. 124, pages 1728 - 1738 | - CHIRGWIN ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1979), vol. 18, pages 5294 - 5299 | - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1989), pages 6.3.1 - 6.3.6 | - GAULTIER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1987), vol. 15, pages 6625 - 6641 | - INOUE ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1987), vol. 15, pages 6131 - 6148 | - INOUE ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1987), vol. 215, pages 327 - 330 | - HASELHOFF; GERLACH, NATURE, (1988), vol. 334, pages 585 - 591 | - BARTEL, D.; SZOSTAK J.W., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 261, pages 1411 - 1418 | - HELENE C., ANTICANCER DRUG DES., (1991), vol. 6, pages 569 - 84 | - HELENE C. ET AL., ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1992), vol. 660, pages 27 - 36 | - MAHER, L.J., BIOASSAYS, (1992), vol. 14, pages 807 - 15 | - GOEDDEL, Gene Expression Technology: Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1990), vol. 185 | - GRUBER; CROSBY, Methods in Plant Molecular Biology and Biotechnolgy, CRC PRESS, pages 89 - 108 | - ROMANOS M.A. ET AL., "Foreign gene expression in yeast: a review", YEAST, (1992), vol. 8, doi:doi:10.1002/yea.320080602, pages 423 - 488, XP002939357 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/yea.320080602 | - "Heterologous gene expression in filamentous fungi", VAN DEN HONDEL, C.A.M.J.J. ET AL., More Gene Manipulations in Fungi, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1991), pages 396 - 428 | - "Gene transfer systems and vector development for filamentous fungi", VAN DEN HONDEL AND PUNT ET AL., Applied Molecular Genetics of Fungi, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1991), pages 1 - 28 | - FALCIATORE ET AL., MARINE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 1, pages 239 - 251 | - SCHMIDT; WILLMITZER, "High efficiency Agrobacterium tumefaciens-mediated transformation of Ar?bidøpsis thaliana leaf and cotyledon plants", PLANT CELL REP., (1988), pages 583 - 586 | - Plant Molecular Biology and Biotechnology, C PRESS, (1993), pages 71 - 119 | - "Techniques for Gene Transfer", WHITE, JENES ET AL., Transgenic Plants, Vol. 1, Engineering and Utilization, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1993), vol. 1, pages 128 - 43 | - POTRYKUS, ANNU. REV. PLANT PHYSIOL. PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 42, pages 205 - 225 | - SMITH; JOHNSON, GENE, (1988), vol. 67, pages 31 - 40 | - AMANN ET AL., GENE, (1988), vol. 69, pages 301 - 315 | - STUDIER ET AL., Gene Expression Technology:Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1990), vol. 185, pages 60 - 89 | - GOTTESMAN S., Gene Expression Technology:Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1990), vol. 185, pages 119 - 128 | - WADA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1992), vol. 20, pages 2111 - 2118 | - BALDARI ET AL., EMBO J., (1987), vol. 6, pages 229 - 234 | - KURJAN; HERSKOWITZ, CELL, (1982), vol. 30, pages 933 - 943 | - SCHULTZ ET AL., GENE, (1987), vol. 54, pages 113 - 123 | - SMITH ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL., (1983), vol. 3, pages 2156 - 2165 | - LUCKLOW; SUMMERS, VIROLOGY, (1989), vol. 170, pages 31 - 39 | - SEED, NATURE, (1987), vol. 329, page 840 | - KAUFMAN ET AL., EMBO J., (1987), vol. 6, pages 187 - 195 | - BECKER; KEMPER; SCHELL; MASTERSON, "New plant binary vectors with selectable markers located proximal to the left border", PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 20, pages 1195 - 1197 | - BEVAN, "Binary Agrobacterium vectors for plant transformation", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1984), vol. 12, pages 8711 - 8721 | - "Vectors for Gene Transfer in Higher Plants", KUNG UND R. WU, Transgenic Plants,, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1993), vol. 1, pages 15 - 38 | - GIELEN ET AL., EMBO J., (1984), vol. 3, page 835 | - GALLIE ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1987), vol. 15, pages 8693 - 8711 | - BENFEY ET AL., EMBO J., (1989), vol. 8, pages 2195 - 2202 | - FRANCK ET AL., CELL, (1980), vol. 21, pages 285 - 294 | - BAEUMLEIN ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENETICS, (1991), vol. 225, pages 459 - 67 | - BAEUMLEIN ET AL., PLANT J., (1992), vol. 2, pages 233 - 239 | - GATZ, ANNU. REV. PLANT PHYSIOL. PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1997), vol. 48, pages 89 - 108 | - GATZ ET AL., PLANT J., (1992), vol. 2, pages 397 - 404 | - WARD ET AL., PLANT. MOL. BIOL., (1993), vol. 22, pages 361 - 366 | - KERMODE, CRIT. REV. PLANT SCI., (1996), vol. 15, pages 285 - 423 | - WEINTRAUB ET AL., "Antisense RNA as a molecular tool for genetic analysis", REVIEWS - TRENDS IN GENETICS, (1986), vol. 1 | - MOL ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1990), vol. 268, pages 427 - 430 | - "Agrobacterium protocols", GARTLAND AND DAVEY,, Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, (1995), vol. 44 | - COLE-STRAUSS ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1999), vol. 27, pages 1323 - 1330 | - KMIEC, AMERICAN SCIENTIST, (1999), vol. 87, pages 240 - 247 | - THOMAS; CAPECCHI, CELL, (1987), vol. 51, page 503 | - PONTIER D; MIAO ZH; LAM E, PLANT J, (200109), vol. 27, no. 6, pages 529 - 38 | - NARANG, TETRAHEDRON, (1983), vol. 39, page 3 | - ITAKURA ET AL., ANNU. REV. BIOCHEM., (1984), vol. 53, page 323 | - ITAKURA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1984), vol. 198, page 1056 | - IKE ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1983), vol. 11, page 477 | - ARKIN; YOURVAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 7811 - 7815 | - DELGRAVE ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1993), vol. 6, pages 327 - 331 | - MITSUKAWA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 7098 - 7102 | - HURRY ET AL., PLANT J., (2000), vol. 24, pages 383 - 396 | - HARTEL ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 10649 - 10654 | - SAVAGE; OHLROGGE, PLANT J., (1999), vol. 18, pages 521 - 527 | - MULLER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, pages 19475 - 19481 | - MERLOT ET AL., PLANT J., (2001), vol. 25, pages 295 - 303 | - KELLY ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 163 - 167 | - BEBBINGTON ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 169 - 175 | - STITES ET AL., Basic and Clinical Immunology,, Fourth Edition, LANGE MEDICAL PUBLICATIONS | - OGAS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 277, pages 91 - 94 | - OGAS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 13839 - 13844 | - SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 277, pages 91 - 94 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 13839 - 13844 | - FOCKS; BENNING, PLANT PHYSIO, (1998), vol. 118, pages 91 - 101 | - BRENNER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 97, pages 1665 - 1670 | - BRENNER ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., vol. 18, pages 630 - 4 | - CHANDRASHEKHAR ET AL., PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1997), vol. 35, pages 993 - 1001 | - GU ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1994), vol. 17, pages 257 - 262 | - AMASINO, ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1986), vol. 152, page 304 | - PEARSON W.R., "Rapid and sensitive sequence comparison with FASTP and FASTA", METHODS ENZYMOL., (1990), vol. 183, doi:doi:10.1016/0076-6879(90)83007-V, pages 63 - 98, XP000670614 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0076-6879(90)83007-V | - ALTSCHUL S.F.; GISH W.; MILLER W.; MYERS E.W.; LIPMAN D.J., "Basic local alignment search tool.", J. MOL. BIOL., vol. 215, doi:doi:10.1006/jmbi.1990.9999, pages 403 - 410, XP002949123 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1990.9999 | - FRISHMAN; ARGOS, "75% accuracy in protein secondary structure prediction", PROTEINS, (1997), vol. 27, pages 329 - 335 | - THOMPSON, J.D.; HIGGINS, D.G.; GIBSON, T.J., "CLUSTAL W: improving the sensitivity of progressive multiple sequence alignment through sequence weighting, positions-specific gap penalties and weight matrix choice", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1994), vol. 22, pages 4673 - 4680, XP002956304 | - PERSSON B.; ARGOS P., "Prediction of transmembrane segments in proteins utilizing multiple sequence alignments", J. MOL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 237, doi:doi:10.1006/jmbi.1994.1220, pages 182 - 192, XP024008472 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1994.1220 | - KLEIN P.; KANEHISA M.; DELISI C., "Prediction of protein function from sequence properties: A discriminant analysis of a database", BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1984), vol. 787, doi:doi:10.1016/0167-4838(84)90312-1, pages 221 - 226, XP023477090 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-4838(84)90312-1 | - KOLAKOWSKI L.F. JR.; LEUNISSEN J.A.M.; SMITH J.E., "ProSearch: fast searching of protein sequences with regular expression patterns related to protein structure and function", BIOTECHNIQUES, (1992), vol. 13, pages 919 - 921 | - WALLACE; HENIKOFF, "PATMAT:A searching and extraction program for sequence, pattern and block queries and databases", CABIOS, (1992), vol. 8, pages 249 - 254 | - GLICK, BERNARD R.AND THOMPSON, JOHN E., Methods in Plant Molecular Biology and Biotechnology, CRC PRESS, (1993), page 360 | - KONCZ; SCHELL, MOL. GEN. GENET., (1986), vol. 204, pages 383 - 396 | - BECHTOLD, ACAD. SCI. PARIS., (1993), vol. 316, pages 1194 - 1199 | - BENT ET AL., SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 265, pages 1856 - 1860 | - MOLONEY ET AL., PLANT CELL REPORT, (1989), vol. 8, pages 238 - 242 | - DE BLOCK ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (1989), vol. 91, pages 694 - 701 | - MLYNAROVA ET AL., PLANT CELL REPORT, (1994), vol. 13, pages 282 - 285 | - MURASHIGE; SKOOG, PHYSIOL. PLANT., (1962), vol. 15, pages 473 - 497 | - "DNA repair mechanisms", RUPP W.D., Escherichia coli and Salmonella, ASM, (1996), pages 2277 - 2294 | - GREENER; CALLAHAN, STRATEGIES, (1994), vol. 7, pages 32 - 34 | - BORMANN ET AL., MOL. MICROBIOL., (1992), vol. 6, pages 317 - 326 | - KOLMAR H. ET AL., EMBO J., (1995), vol. 14, pages 3895 - 3904 | - "Pores, Channels and Transporters, in Biomembranes", GENNIS R.B., Molecular Structure and Function, SPRINGER, (1989), pages 85 - 137 | - Methods of Enzymatic Analysis,3rd ed., VERLAG CHEMIE, (1983), vol. I-XII | - Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, VCH, (1987), vol. A9, pages 352 - 363 | - ULLMAN, Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, VCH, (1985), vol. A2, pages 89 - 90,443-6 | - FALLON, A. ET AL., APPLICATIONS OF HPLC IN BIOCHEMISTRY IN: LABORATORY TECHNIQUES IN BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1987), vol. 17 | - "Product recovery and purification", REHM ET AL., Biotechnology, VCH, (1993), vol. 3, pages 469 - 714 | - "Biochemical separations", SHAEIWITZ J.A., HENRY J.D., Ulmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, Separation and purification techniques in biotechnology, VCH, (1988), vol. B3, pages 1 - 27 | - CAHOON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, no. 22, pages 12935 - 12940 | - BROWSE ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEMISTRY, (1986), vol. 442, pages 141 - 145 | - CHRISTIE, WILLIAM W., Advances in Lipid Methodology, AYR/SCOTLAND :OILY PRESS | - "Gas Chromatography and Lipids", CHRISTIE, WILLIAM W., A Practical Guide - Ayr, SCOTLAND :OILY PRESS, (1989), vol. IX, page 307 | - Progress in Lipid Research, PERGAMON PRESS, (1952), vol. 1, page 16 | - Advances on Lipid Methodology 4th ed., OILY PRESS, (1997), pages 119 - 169 | - LEMIEUX ET AL., THEOR. APPL. GENET., (1990), vol. 80, pages 234 - 240 | - FOCKS; BENNING, PLANT PHYSIOL., (1998), vol. 118, pages 91 - 101 | - SIEBERTZ; HEINZ, Z. NATURFORSCH., (1977), vol. 32C, pages 193 - 205 | - ECCLESTON; OHLROGGE, PLANT CELL, (1998), vol. 10, pages 613 - 621 | - STITT M.; LILLEY R.MC.C.; GERHARDT R.; HELDT M.W., "Determination of metabolite levels in specific cells and subcellular compartments of plant leaves", METHODS ENZYMOL., (1989), vol. 174, doi:doi:10.1016/0076-6879(89)74035-0, pages 518 - 552, XP000864424 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0076-6879(89)74035-0 | - HäRTEL ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL. BIOCHEM., (1998), vol. 36, pages 407 - 417 | - BRADFORD M.M., "A rapid and sensitive method for the quantification of microgram quantities of protein using the principle of protein dye binding", ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1976), vol. 72, pages 248 - 254 | - RENZ ET AL., PLANTA, (1993), vol. 190, pages 156 - 165 | - BURRELL ET AL., PLANTA, (1994), vol. 194, pages 95 - 101 | - ZRENNER ET AL., PLANT J., (1995), vol. 7, pages 97 - 107 | - JELITTO ET AL., PLANTA, (1992), vol. 188, pages 238 - 244 | - FIEHN ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH., (2000), vol. 18, pages 1447 - 1161 | - GIRKE, PLANT J., (1998), vol. 15, pages 39 - 48 | - PUTTARAJU ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH., (1999), vol. 17, pages 246 - 252 | - PATEK ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1994), vol. 60, pages 133 - 140 | - MALAKHOVA ET AL., BIOTEKHNOLOGIYA, (1996), vol. 11, pages 27 - 32 | - SCHMIDT ET AL., BIOPROCESS ENGINEER, (1998), vol. 19, pages 67 - 70 | - Ulmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, VCH, (1996), vol. A27, pages 89-90 - 540-547 | - S. HENIKOFF; J. G. HENIKOFF, "Protein family classification based on searching a database of blocks", GENOMICS, (1994), vol. 19, doi:doi:10.1006/geno.1994.1018, pages 97 - 107, XP024796980 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.1994.1018 |