EP2267610 - Monitoring and reporting system using cellular carriers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEI, Inc. 3222 Phoenixville Pike Suite 200 Malvern, PA 19355 / US | [2013/10] |
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states MEI, Inc. 1301 Wilson Drive West Chester, PA 19380 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McGarry, Patrik J. 1211 Gateway Lane West Chester PA 19380 / US | 02 /
Reger, Philip Rene 126 Northwood Road Newtown Square PA 19703 / US | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. HighLight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10174894.5 | 12.11.1998 | [2010/52] | Priority number, date | US19970978811 | 26.11.1997 Original published format: US 978811 | [2010/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2267610 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
G07F5/18 (EP,US);
G07F9/002 (EP,US);
G07F19/208 (EP,US);
G07F9/001 (EP,US);
G07F9/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2010/52] | Title | German: | Überwachungs- und Meldesystem, welches zellenförmige Träger benutzt | [2010/52] | English: | Monitoring and reporting system using cellular carriers | [2010/52] | French: | Système de surveillance et de signalisation faisant intervenir des porteurs cellulaires | [2010/52] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 04.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/17] | 13.03.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.05.2014 | 28.05.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98957820.8 / EP1032890 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980957820) is 24.08.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 01.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 01.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5608643 (WICHTER MARTIN A [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 31 - line 34 * * column 7, line 42 - line 59 * * column 9, line 16 - line 22 * * column 29, line 31 - line 35 * * abstract * * column 3, paragraph L - column 3, paragraph 1 * * column 5, line 36 - line 39 * * column 7, line 1 - line 5 *[I] 2-8 | Examination | JPH04336655 | JPH08194584 | by applicant | US4412292 |