EP2295926 - Telescopic sight [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Sports Optics GmbH Gloelstrasse 3-5 35576 Wetzlar / DE | [2014/30] |
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Sports Optics GmbH Gloelstrasse 3-5 35576 Wetzlar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlierbach, Armin Flutgraben 17 35638 Leun / DE | [2011/11] | Representative(s) | Freischem & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Salierring 47-53 50677 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Patentanwälte Freischem Salierring 47-53 50677 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2011/11] | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 10175019.8 | 02.09.2010 | [2011/11] | Priority number, date | DE20091039851 | 03.09.2009 Original published format: DE102009039851 | [2011/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2295926 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2295926 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/30] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2295926 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F41G1/38, F41G3/00, G01C1/04, G02B27/14 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
G02B23/04 (EP,US);
F41G3/065 (EP,US);
G02B27/1006 (EP,US);
G02B27/1073 (EP,US);
G02B27/14 (EP,US);
G02B27/141 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/11] | Title | German: | Zielfernrohr | [2011/11] | English: | Telescopic sight | [2011/11] | French: | Lunette de visée | [2011/11] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 06.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.09.2010 | AL | 23.07.2014 | CY | 23.07.2014 | CZ | 23.07.2014 | DK | 23.07.2014 | EE | 23.07.2014 | ES | 23.07.2014 | FI | 23.07.2014 | HR | 23.07.2014 | IT | 23.07.2014 | LT | 23.07.2014 | LV | 23.07.2014 | MC | 23.07.2014 | MK | 23.07.2014 | MT | 23.07.2014 | NL | 23.07.2014 | PL | 23.07.2014 | RO | 23.07.2014 | SE | 23.07.2014 | SI | 23.07.2014 | SK | 23.07.2014 | SM | 23.07.2014 | TR | 23.07.2014 | IE | 02.09.2014 | LU | 02.09.2014 | BE | 30.09.2014 | FR | 30.09.2014 | BG | 23.10.2014 | GB | 23.10.2014 | NO | 23.10.2014 | GR | 24.10.2014 | IS | 23.11.2014 | PT | 24.11.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 02.09.2010 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MK | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
TR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 02.09.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GB | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 02.09.2010 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
TR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 02.09.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GB | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 02.09.2010 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 02.09.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GB | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 02.09.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GB | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 02.09.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GB | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 02.09.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GB | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 02.09.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GB | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 02.09.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GB | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GB | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
LU | 02.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 23.07.2014 | |
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 23.07.2014 | |
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 23.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5126549 (YAMADA KENJI [JP]) [Y] 7 * column 3, lines 22-55; figures 4,6 *; | [Y]EP0709705 (SWAROVSKI OPTIK KG [AT]) [Y] 2,10-13 * column 6, lines 15-24; figure 2 * * column 7, lines 25-35 *; | [Y]WO0077554 (PERGER ANDREAS [AT]) [Y] 1,2,4,5,17-19 * page 1, line 32 - page 2, line 7 * * page 3, line 34 - page 4, line 35 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE19933172 (LEICA CAMERA AG [DE], et al) [Y] 3,6,8,9,14-16,19 * column 2, lines 5-45 * * column 4, lines 1-42 * * figures 1a-1c,2a-2c *; | [Y]EP2078975 (ZEISS CARL SPORTS OPTICS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 17 * paragraphs [0047] - [0053]; figures 1,2,5 *; | [Y]WO2009094687 (SWAROVSKI OPTIK KG [AT], et al) [Y] 17,18* page 16, line 11 - page 17, line 21; figures 2,3 *; | [Y] - BRAUCKHOFF, "Arbeitsheft für das Fach Gewehr G 36", 20060101, (20060101), pages 1 - 21, XP007915923 [Y] 1-19 * "Explosionsdarstellung - Visiereinrichtung"; page 19 * | by applicant | DE4438955 | WO0077554 | DE19933172 | EP0709705 | US2005219690 | WO2006084689 | WO2008099939 |