EP2299174 - Burner for industrial kiln [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siti - B&T Group S.p.A. Via Prampolini, 18 41043 Formigine (Modena) / IT | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tarozzi, Fausto Siti - B&T Group S.p.A. c/o Siti B&T Group S.p.A. 41043 Formigine (Modena) / IT | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | Feltrinelli, Secondo Andrea APTA S.r.l. Via Ca' di Cozzi, 41 37124 Verona / IT | [2011/12] | Application number, filing date | 10175132.9 | 02.09.2010 | [2011/12] | Priority number, date | IT2009BO00564 | 03.09.2009 Original published format: IT BO20090564 | [2011/12] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2299174 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F23C9/08, F23D14/24 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
F23C9/08 (EP);
F23D14/24 (EP);
F23D91/02 (EP);
F23C2202/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Brenner für einen Industrieofen | [2011/12] | English: | Burner for industrial kiln | [2011/12] | French: | Brûleur pour un four industriel | [2011/12] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/13] | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2005247300 (COLLIER DAVID [US]) [X] 1,3-11,15,17,18 * page 2, paragraph 18 - page 3, paragraph 27 * * figures 1-5 * [Y] 12; | [X]US7104784 (HASEGAWA TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,15,17,18 * column 1, line 15 - line 25 * * column 11, line 6 - column 12, line 22 * * column 14, line 24 - line 41 * * figures 6,9,10,26 *; | [X]US6029614 (KAYAHARA TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,15 * column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 20 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US2004115575 (KAYAHARA TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,15 * page 3, paragraph 45 - page 4, paragraph 47 * * page 4, paragraph 57 - page 5, paragraph 59 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE102005008617 (AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [Y] 12 * page 2, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 45 - paragraph 52 * * figure 1 * |