EP2295400 - Process for the hydrocyanation of naturally occurring oils [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/11] | Process of hydrocyanation of unsaturated carboxylic acid derivatives | ||
[2014/40] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Invista Technologies S.à.r.l. Zweigniederlassung St. Gallen Kreuzackerstrasse 9 9000 St. Gallen / CH | [2012/33] |
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states Invista Technologies S.à.r.l. Talstrasse 80 8001 Zurich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allgeier, Alan Martin 4781 Taranto Way Oak Park, CA 91377 / US | 02 /
Lenges, Christian Peter 3 Bauer Lane Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | [2011/11] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/11] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10175248.3 | 08.09.2004 | [2011/11] | Priority number, date | US20030501927P | 11.09.2003 Original published format: US 501927 P | [2011/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2295400 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2295400 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07C227/04, C07C227/06, C07C227/28, C07C229/08, C07C253/10, C07C255/19 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
C07C255/19 (EP,US);
C07C227/04 (EP,US);
C07C227/06 (EP,US);
C07C227/28 (EP,US);
C07C253/10 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C227/04, C07C229/08 (US,EP);
C07C227/06, C07C229/08 (EP,US);
C07C227/28, C07C229/08 (US,EP);
C07C253/10, C07C255/19 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2011/11] | C07C227/28, C07C229/08, C07C253/10, C07C255/19 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, NL [2011/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Hydrocyanierung von natürlich vorkommenden Ölen | [2014/40] | English: | Process for the hydrocyanation of naturally occurring oils | [2014/40] | French: | Procédé d'hydrocyanation d'huiles naturelles | [2014/40] |
Former [2011/11] | Verfahren zur Hydrocyanierung von ungesättigten Carboxylsäurederivaten | ||
Former [2011/11] | Process of hydrocyanation of unsaturated carboxylic acid derivatives | ||
Former [2011/11] | Processus d'hydrocyanation des dérivés d'acide carboxylique non saturé | Examination procedure | 31.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 27.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/51] | 23.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/51] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04783415.5 / EP1663957 | EP09001657.7 / EP2058298 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040783415) is 09.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3701802 (MAERKER GERHARD, et al) [A] 1-9 * examples 7,8; claim - *; | [A]WO9514659 (DU PONT [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 3, line 5 - line 21 * * page 12, line 25 - page 14, line 17; example 15 *; | [AD]WO9906358 (DU PONT [US]) [AD] 1-9 * page 2, line 22 - page 6, line 30 *; | [A]WO0240440 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 8 * abstract * * page 11, line 33 - page 12, line 11 * * page 8 * | [AD] - GOERTZ, W. ET AL, "Application of chelating diphosphine ligands in the nickel-catalysed hydrocyanation of alk-1-enes and gamma-unsaturated fatty acid esters", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 16, pages 1521 - 1522, XP002318778 [AD] 1-9 * page 1521; figure 1; tables 1,2 * * page 1522, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/a702811c | [A] - HUTHMACHER, K. ET AL., "2.5 Reactions with Hydrogen Cyanide (Hydrocyanation)", APPLIED HOMOGENEOUS CATALYSIS WITH ORGANOMETALLIC COMPOUNDS, (1996), pages 465 - 486, XP002531996 [A] 1-9 * pages 465,473 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/9783527619351.ch2e | by applicant | WO9906358 | US5512695 | US5512696 | US5663369 | US5688986 | US5723641 | US5959135 | US6120700 | US6171996 | US6171997 | US6399534 | US5523453 | US5693843 | - GOERTZ ET AL., CHEM. COMMUN., (1997), vol. 1521 | - TAKAO, YUJI ET AL., JOURNAL OF HEALTH SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 49, no. 1, pages 88 - 90 |