EP2298918 - Regulation of Plant Biomass and Stress Tolerance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mendel Biotechnology, Inc. 3935 Point Eden Way Hayward, CA 94545 / US | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gutterson, Neal 5169 Golden Gate Avenue Oakland, CA 94618 / US | 02 /
Kumimoto, Roderick W. 517 Oak Avenue San Bruno, CA 94066 / US | 03 /
Keddie, James S. 20 14th Avenue San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | 04 /
Sherman, Bradley K. 1039 Overlook Road Berkeley, CA 94708 / US | 05 /
Libby, Jeffrey M. 7984 Folkestone Drive Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 06 /
Jiang, Cai-Zhong 2340 Caravaggio Drive Davis, CA 95618 / US | 07 /
Heard, Jacqueline E. 542 Sunnyside Avenue Webster Groves, MO 63119 / US | 08 /
Ratcliffe, Oliver 814 East 21st Street Oakland, CA 94606 / US | 09 /
Hempel, Frederick D. 1101 Neilson Street Albany, CA 94706 / US | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2011/12] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 10175334.1 | 17.09.2004 | [2011/12] | Priority number, date | US20030669824 | 23.09.2003 Original published format: US 669824 | US20040870198 | 16.06.2004 Original published format: US 870198 | US20040565948P | 26.04.2004 Original published format: US 565948 P | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2298918 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2298918 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | [2011/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2298918 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C07K14/415, A01H5/00, A01H5/10 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
C12N15/8271 (EP,US);
C12N15/8216 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/12] | Title | German: | REGULATION VON BIOMASSE UND STRESSTOLERANZ IN PFLANZEN | [2011/25] | English: | Regulation of Plant Biomass and Stress Tolerance | [2011/12] | French: | REGULATION DE LA BIOMASSE ET DE LA TOLERANCE AU STRESS DE PLANTES | [2011/25] |
Former [2011/12] | Regulation von Biomasse und Stresstoleranz in Pflanzen | ||
Former [2011/12] | Regulation de la biomasse et de la tolerance au stress de plantes | Examination procedure | 16.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 06.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 22.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04784569.8 / EP1668140 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040784569) is 20.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.09.2004 | AT | 02.07.2014 | BE | 02.07.2014 | CY | 02.07.2014 | CZ | 02.07.2014 | DK | 02.07.2014 | EE | 02.07.2014 | FI | 02.07.2014 | IT | 02.07.2014 | MC | 02.07.2014 | NL | 02.07.2014 | PL | 02.07.2014 | RO | 02.07.2014 | SE | 02.07.2014 | SI | 02.07.2014 | SK | 02.07.2014 | TR | 02.07.2014 | IE | 17.09.2014 | LU | 17.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | FR | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | BG | 02.10.2014 | GR | 03.10.2014 | PT | 03.11.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 17.09.2004 | |
AT | 02.07.2014 | ||
BE | 02.07.2014 | ||
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 17.09.2014 | ||
LU | 17.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 17.09.2014 | ||
LU | 17.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 17.09.2014 | ||
LU | 17.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 17.09.2014 | ||
LU | 17.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
LU | 17.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
LU | 17.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
LU | 17.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
LU | 17.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 02.07.2014 | |
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 02.07.2014 | |
SE | 02.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02079403 (MENDEL BIOTECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0136444 (MENDEL BIOTECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * table 3 *; | [X]WO0126459 (MENDEL BIOTECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003121070 (ADAM LUC [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0136598 (MENDEL BIOTECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13; | [A]US6417428 (THOMASHOW MICHAEL F [US], et al) [A] 1-13 | by applicant | US5426039 | US6664446 | US2004045049 | US2004098764 | US6717034 | US6262333 | US2001010913 | US5811238 | US5837500 | US6242568 | US5773697 | US5783393 | US4943674 | US5618988 | US5837848 | US5905186 | US5792929 | US4407956 | WO8501856 | US6417428 | EP0271988 | US4987071 | US5543508 | US5231020 | US5583021 | US5658772 | WO9606166 | WO9853057 | US5571706 | US5677175 | US5510471 | US5750386 | US5597945 | US5589615 | US5750871 | US5268526 | US5780708 | US5538880 | US5773269 | US5736369 | US5610042 | US6521453 | US5563055 | US5015580 | US5322783 | US6613962 | US5591616 | - SIMPSON, Water Stress on Plants, PRAEGER, (1981), pages 235 - 265 | - HALL ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (2000), vol. 123, pages 1449 - 1458 | - MCCUE; HANSON, TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (1990), vol. 8, pages 358 - 362 | - XIONG; ZHU, PLANT CELL ENVIRON., (2002), vol. 25, pages 131 - 139 | - KNIGHT, INT. REV. CYTOL., (2000), vol. 195, pages 269 - 324 | - SANDERS ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1999), vol. 11, pages 691 - 706 | - MERLOT ET AL., PLANT J., (2001), vol. 25, pages 295 - 303 | - TäHTIHARJU; PALVA, PLANT J., (2001), vol. 26, pages 461 - 470 | - XIONG ET AL., GENES DEV., (2001), vol. 15, pages 1971 - 1984 | - FRANK ET AL., PLANT CELL, (2000), vol. 12, pages 111 - 124 | - HASEGAWA ET AL., ANNU. REV. PLANT MOL. PLANT PHYSIOL., (2000), vol. 51, pages 463 - 499 | - SAIJO ET AL., PLANT J., (2000), vol. 23, pages 319 - 327 | - GAXIOLA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 11444 - 11449 | - ANN. MISSOURI BOT. GARD., (1998), vol. 84, pages 1 - 49 | - DALY ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (2001), vol. 127, pages 1328 - 1333 | - KU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 9121 - 9126 | - CHASE ET AL., ANN. MISSOURI BOT. GARD., (1993), vol. 80, pages 528 - 580 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 290, pages 2105 - 2110 | - REEVES; BECKERBAUER, BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (2001), vol. 1519, pages 13 - 29 | - REEVES, GENE, (2001), vol. 277, pages 63 - 81 | - REEVES; NISSON, BIOL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 265, pages 8573 - 8582 | - KASHIMA ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 313, pages 402 - 404 | - TUDGE, The Variety of Life, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (2000), pages 547 - 606 | - PENG ET AL., GENES DEVELOPMENT, (1997), vol. 11, pages 3194 - 3205 | - PENG ET AL., NATURE, (1999), vol. 400, pages 256 - 261 | - FU ET AL., PLANT CELL, (2001), vol. 13, pages 1791 - 1802 | - NANDI ET AL., CURR. BIOL., (2000), vol. 10, pages 215 - 218 | - COUPLAND, NATURE, (1995), vol. 377, pages 482 - 483 | - WEIGEL; NILSSON, NATURE, (1995), vol. 377, pages 482 - 500 | - MANDEL ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 71, pages 133 - 143 | - SUZUKI ET AL., PLANT J., (2001), vol. 28, pages 409 - 418 | - MüLLER ET AL., PLANT J., (2001), vol. 28, pages 169 - 179 | - KILN ET AL., PLANT J., (2001), vol. 25, pages 247 - 259 | - KYOZUKA; SHIMAMOTO, PLANT CELL PHYSIOL., (2002), vol. 43, pages 130 - 135 | - BOSS; THOMAS, NATURE, (2002), vol. 416, pages 847 - 850 | - HE ET AL., TRANSGENIC RES., (2000), vol. 9, pages 223 - 227 | - ROBSON ET AL., PLANT J., (2001), vol. 28, pages 619 - 631 | - GILMOUR ET AL., PLANT J., (1998), vol. 16, pages 433 - 442 | - JAGLO ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (2001), vol. 127, pages 910 - 917 | - BRUCE ET AL., PLANT CELL, (2000), vol. 12, pages 65 - 79 | - BOREVITZ ET AL., PLANT CELL, (2000), vol. 12, pages 2383 - 2393 | - BHATTACHARJEE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 13790 - 13795 | - XU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI, USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 15089 - 15094 | - FEDERAL REGISTER, (2001), vol. 66, no. 4, page 1095 | - ONATE ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL., (1994), vol. 14, pages 3376 - 3391 | - FALVO ET AL., CELL, (1995), vol. 83, pages 1101 - 1111 | - HUTH ET AL., NAT. STRUCT. BIOL., (1997), vol. 4, pages 657 - 665 | - GIRARD ET AL., EMBO J., (1998), vol. 17, pages 2079 - 2085 | - NIETO-SOTELO; QUAIL, BIOCHEM. SOC. SYNIP., (1994), vol. 60, pages 265 - 275 | - MEIJER ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 31, pages 607 - 618 | - GUPTA ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1997), vol. 35, pages 987 - 992 | - GUPTA ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1997), vol. 34, pages 529 - 536 | - "Guide to Molecular Cloning Techniques", BERGER; KIMMEL, Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC., (1987), vol. 152 | - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning - A Laboratory Manual(2nd Edition), COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, (1989), vol. 1-3 | - CHENG ET AL., NATURE, (1994), vol. 369, pages 684 - 685 | - BEAUCAGE ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1981), vol. 22, pages 1859 - 1869 | - MATTHES ET AL., EMBO J, (1984), vol. 3, pages 801 - 805 | - THOMPSON ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1994), vol. 22, pages 4673 - 4680 | - HIGGINS ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1996), vol. 266, pages 383 - 402 | - FENG; DOOLITTLE, J. MOL. E, (1987), vol. 25, pages 351 - 360 | - RATCLIFFE ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (2001), vol. 126, pages 122 - 132 | - MOUNT, Bioinformatics: Sequence and Genome Analysis, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (2001), page 543 | - GOODRICH ET AL., CELL, (1993), vol. 75, pages 519 - 530 | - LIN ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 353, pages 569 - 571 | - SADOWSKI ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 335, pages 563 - 564 | - LEE ET AL., GENOME RES., (2002), vol. 12, pages 493 - 502 | - REMM ET AL., J MOL. BIOL., (2001), vol. 314, pages 1041 - 1052 | - GIHNOUR ET AL., PLANT J., (1998), vol. 16, pages 433 - 442 | - JAGLO ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (1998), vol. 127, pages 910 - 917 | - CHERN ET AL., PLANT J., (2001), vol. 27, pages 101 - 113 | - FAN; DONG, PLANT CELL, (2002), vol. 14, pages 1377 - 1389 | - KOSUGI; OHASHI, PLANT J., (2002), vol. 29, pages 45 - 59 | - GAMPALA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 277, pages 1689 - 1694 | - GOCAL ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (2001), vol. 127, pages 1682 - 1693 | - BOREVITZ ET AL., PLANT CELL, (2000), vol. 12, pages 2383 - 2394 | - HIGGINS; SHARP, GENE, (1988), vol. 73, pages 237 - 244 | - Methods in Enzymology, vol. 266, Computer Methods for Macromolecular Sequence Analysis, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC., (1996), vol. 266 | - SHPAER, METHODS MOL. BIOL., (1997), vol. 70, pages 173 - 187 | - HEIN, METHODS ENZYMOL., (1990), vol. 183, pages 626 - 645 | - BAIROCH ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 217 - 221 | - SMITH ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1992), vol. 5, pages 35 - 51 | - ALTSCHUL, J. MOL. E, (1993), vol. 36, pages 290 - 300 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - HENIKOFF; HENIKOFF, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1991), vol. 19, pages 6565 - 6572 | - EDDY, CURRO OPIN. STR. BIOL., (1996), vol. 6, pages 361 - 365 | - SONNHAMMER ET AL., PROTEINS, (1997), vol. 28, pages 405 - 420 | - MEYERS, Molecular Biology and Biotechnology, WILEY VCH, (1995), pages 856 - 853 | - FOWLER ET AL., PLANT CELL, (2002), vol. 14, pages 1675 - 1679 | - WAHL; BERGER, METHODS ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 152, pages 399 - 407 | - KIMMEL, METHODS ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 152, pages 507 - 511 | - "Quantitative Filter Hybridisation", ANDERSON; YOUNG, Nucleic Acid Hybridisation, A Practical Approach, IRL PRESS, (1985), pages 73 - 111 | - Methods Enzymol., ACADEMIC PRESS, (1993), vol. 217 | - STEMMER, NATURE, (1994), vol. 370, pages 389 - 391 | - STEMMER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 10747 - 10751 | - ZHANG ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, pages 33850 - 33860 | - LIU ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, pages 11323 - 11334 | - ISALAN ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (2001), vol. 19, pages 656 - 660 | - MOORE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 376 - 381 | - AOYAMA ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1995), vol. 7, pages 1773 - 1785 | - MA; PTASHNE, CELL, (1987), vol. 51, pages 113 - 119 | - GINIGER; PTASHNE, NATURE, (1987), vol. 330, pages 670 - 672 | - HERRERA-ESTRELLA ET AL., NATURE, (1983), vol. 303, page 209 | - BEVAN, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1984), vol. 12, pages 8711 - 8721 | - KLEE, RIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1985), vol. 3, pages 637 - 642 | - CHRISTOU, BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 9, pages 957 - 962 | - GORDON-KAMM, PLANT CELL, (1990), vol. 2, pages 603 - 618 | - WEEKS ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (1993), vol. 102, pages 1077 - 1084 | - VASIL, BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 10, pages 667 - 674 | - WAN; LEMEAUX, PLANT PHYSIOL., (1994), vol. 104, pages 37 - 48 | - ISHIDA ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (1996), vol. 14, pages 745 - 750 | - ODELL ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 313, pages 810 - 812 | - AN ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (1988), vol. 88, pages 547 - 552 | - FROMM ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1989), vol. 1, pages 977 - 984 | - BIRD ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1988), vol. 11, pages 651 - 662 | - KUNST ET AL., BIOCHEM. SOC. TRANS., (1999), vol. 28, pages 651 - 654 | - RINGLI; KELLER, PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 37, pages 977 - 988 | - KAISER ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1995), vol. 28, pages 231 - 243 | - BAERSON ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 26, pages 1947 - 1959 | - OHL ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1990), vol. 2, pages 837 - 848 | - BAERSON ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1993), vol. 22, pages 255 - 267 | - KOP ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1999), vol. 39, pages 979 - 990 | - BAUMANN ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1999), vol. 11, pages 323 - 334 | - GUEVARA-GARCIA, PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 38, pages 743 - 753 | - SHI ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 38, pages 1053 - 1060 | - WILLMOTT ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 38, pages 817 - 825 | - AINLEY ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1993), vol. 22, pages 13 - 23 | - KUHLEMEIER ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1989), vol. 1, pages 471 - 478 | - SCHAFFNER; SHEEN, PLANT CELL, (1991), vol. 3, pages 997 - 1012 | - WUNI, SIEBERTZ ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1989), vol. 1, pages 961 - 968 | - BUCHEL ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1999), vol. 40, pages 387 - 396 | - MANNERS ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 38, pages 1071 - 1080 | - GATZ, ANNU. REV. PLANT PHYSIOL. PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1997), vol. 48, pages 89 - 108 | - GAN; AMASINO, SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 270, pages 1986 - 1988 | - ODELL ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (1994), vol. 106, pages 447 - 45 8 | - FROMM ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, pages 5824 - 5828 | - HOHN ET AL., Molecular Biology of Plant Tumors, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1982), pages 549 - 560 | - KLEIN ET AL., NATURE, (1987), vol. 327, pages 70 - 73 | - HORSCH ET AL., SCIENCE, (1984), vol. 233, pages 496 - 498 | - FRALEY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1983), vol. 80, pages 4803 - 4807 | - BULYK ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (1999), vol. 17, pages 573 - 577 | - CHIEN ET AL., PROC NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 9578 - 9582 | - PENG ET AL., GENES AND DEVELOPMENT, (1997), vol. 11, pages 3194 - 3205 | - NANDI ET AL., CURR. BIOI., (2000), vol. 10, pages 215 - 218 | - MIZUKAMI, CM?R OPINION PLANT BIOL., (2001), vol. 4, pages 533 - 39 | - MIZUKAMI; FISHER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 942 - 947 | - HU ET AL., PLANT CELL, (2003), vol. 15, page 1591 | - HSIEH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 13965 - 13970 | - XIONG; ISHITANI; ZHU, PLANT PHYSIOL., (1999), vol. 119, pages 205 - 212 | - BOSTOCK; QUATRANO, PLANT PHYSIOL., (1992), vol. 98, pages 1356 - 1363 | - ISHITANI ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1997), vol. 9, pages 1935 - 1949 | - ZHU, ANN. REV. PLANT BIOL., (2002), vol. 53, pages 247 - 273 | - KASUGA ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH., (1999), vol. 17, pages 287 - 291 | - UNO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 11632 - 11637 | - PATHARKER; CUSHMAN, PLANT J., (2000), vol. 24, pages 679 - 691 | - YELENOSKY, PLANT PHYSIOL, (1989), vol. 89, pages 444 - 451 | - SIMINOVITCH ET AL., PLANT PLIYSIOL, (1982), vol. 69, pages 250 - 255 | - GUY ET AL., PLANTA, (1992), vol. 188, pages 265 - 270 | - WANG ET AL., ACTA HORT. (ISHS), (2001), vol. 560, pages 285 - 292 | - WOLTER ET AL., EMBO J., (1992), pages 4685 - 4692 | - MURATA ET AL., NATURE, (1992), vol. 356, pages 710 - 713 | - CROWLEY ET AL., CELL, (1985), vol. 43, pages 633 - 641 | - ROSENBERG ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 313, pages 703 - 706 | - PREISS ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 313, pages 27 - 32 | - MELTON, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, pages 144 - 148 | - IZANT; WEINTRAUB, SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, pages 345 - 352 | - KIM; WOLD, CELL, (1985), vol. 42, pages 129 - 138 | - SMITH ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 334, pages 724 - 726 | - SMITH ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 14, pages 369 - 379 | - SHARP, GENES AND DEVELOPMENT, (1999), vol. 13, pages 139 - 141 | - CONSTANS, THE SCIENTIST, (2002), vol. 16, page 36 | - ZAMORE, NATURE STRUCT. BIOL., (2001), vol. 8, pages 746 - 50 | - BRUMMELKAMP ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 296, pages 550 - 553 | - PADDISON ET AL., GENES & DEV., (2002), vol. 16, pages 948 - 958 | - HAMMOND ET AL., NATURE REV GEN, (2001), vol. 2, pages 110 - 119 | - FIRE ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, pages 806 - 811 | - TIMMONS; FIRE, NATURE, (1998), vol. 395, page 854 | - KEMPIN ET AL., NATURE, (1997), vol. 389, pages 802 - 803 | - ICHIKAWA ET AL., NATURE, (1997), vol. 390, pages 698 - 701 | - KAKIMOTO ET AL., SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 274, pages 982 - 985 | - Handbook of Plant Cell Culture, MACMILLAN PUBL. CO., (1984), vol. 2, 3 | - SHIMAMOTO ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 338, pages 274 - 276 | - FROMM ET AL., BIO/TECHNOL., (1990), vol. 8, pages 833 - 839 | - VASIL ET AL., BIO/TECHNOL., (1990), vol. 8, pages 429 - 434 | - SMITH; WATENNAN, ADV. APPL. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, pages 482 - 489 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453 | - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 2444 - 2448 | - HENIKOFF; HENIKOFF, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 10915 - 10919 | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5787 | - WINANS, MICROBIOL. REV., (1992), vol. 56, pages 12 - 31 | - EYAL ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 19, pages 589 - 599 | - CHRISPEELS ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (2000), vol. 42, pages 279 - 290 | - PIAZZA ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (2002), vol. 128, pages 1077 - 1086 | - ONEIL ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 250, pages 646 - 651 | - SANDERS ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1987), vol. 15, pages 1543 - 1558 | - NAGEL ET AL., FEMSMICROBIOL LETTS., (1990), vol. 67, pages 325 - 328 | - EISEN; BROWN, METHODS ENZYMOL., (1999), vol. 303, pages 179 - 205 | - KOORNNEEF ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENET., (1991), vol. 229, pages 57 - 66 | - WEIGEL ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (2000), vol. 122, pages 1003 - 1013 | - MANDEL ET AL., NATURE, (1992), vol. 360, pages 273 - 277 | - THOMA ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (1994), vol. 105, pages 35 - 45 | - LONG; BARTON, DEVELOPMENT, (1998), vol. 125, pages 3027 - 3035 | - LONG; BARTON, DEV. BIOL., (2000), vol. 218, pages 341 - 353 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - LIN; THOMASHOW, PLANT PHYSIOL., (1992), vol. 99, pages 519 - 525 | - STOCKINGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 1035 - 1040 | - HAJELA ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (1990), vol. 93, pages 1246 - 1252 | - AN, METHODS ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 253, page 292 | - MOLONEY ET AL., PLANT CELL REPORTS, (1989), vol. 8, page 238 | - VIEIRA ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 153, pages 3 - 11 | - GRUBER ET AL., Methods in Plant Molecular Biology and Biotechnology, CRC PRESS, INC., (1993), pages 89 - 119 | - MIKI ET AL., Methods in Plant Molecular Biology and Biotechnology, CRC PRESS, INC., (1993), pages 67 - 88 | - SANFORD ET AL., PART. SCI. TECHNOL., (1987), vol. 5, pages 27 - 37 | - CHRISTOU ET AL., PLANT. J., (1992), vol. 2, pages 275 - 281 | - SANFORD, METHODS ENZYMOL., (1993), vol. 217, pages 483 - 509 | - ZHANG ET AL., BIOLTEEHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 9, pages 996 - 997 | - HAIN ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENET., (1985), vol. 199, pages 161 - 168 | - DRAPER ET AL., PLANT CELL PHYSIOL., (1982), vol. 23, pages 451 - 458 | - DESHAYES ET AL., EMBO J., (1985), vol. 4, pages 2731 - 2737 | - CHRISTOU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 3962 - 3966 | - DONN ET AL., ABSTRACTS OFVIITH INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS ON PLANT CELL AND TISSUE CULTURE IAPTC, (1990), vol. A2-38, page 53 | - D'HALLUIN ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1992), vol. 4, pages 1495 - 1505 | - SPENCER ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 24, pages 51 - 61 | - KOORNNEEF ET AL., Tomato Biotechnology, ALAN R. LISS, INC., (1986), pages 169 - 178 | - VASIL, PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 25, pages 925 - 937 | - CASSAS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 11212 - 11216 | - GORDON-KAMM ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1990), vol. 2, pages 603 - 618 | - ISHIDA, NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (1990), vol. 14, pages 745 - 750 | - VASIL ET AL., BIOLTECHNOL., (1992), vol. 10, pages 667 - 674 | - VASIL ET AL., BIOLTECHNOL., (1993), vol. 11, pages 1553 - 1558 | - CHRISTOU, BIOLTECHNOL., (1991), vol. 9, pages 957 - 962 | - HIEI ET AL., PLANT J., (1994), vol. 6, pages 271 - 282 | - ALDEMITA; HODGES, PLANTA, (1996), vol. 199, pages 612 - 617 | - HIEI ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1997), vol. 35, pages 205 - 218 | - FROMM ET AL., BIOLTECHNOL., (1990), vol. 8, pages 833 - 839 | US19990135134 | US19990125814 | US20000227439 | US20030374780 | US20010338692 | US20020225066 | US20020225068 |