EP2267927 - Multi-mode terminal in a wireless MIMO system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2010/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walton, Rodney J. c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
Ketchum, John W. c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
Wallace, Mark S. c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
Howard, Steven J. c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2014/11] |
Former [2010/52] | 01 /
Walton, Rodney J. c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | ||
02 /
Ketchum, John W. c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | |||
03 /
Wallace, Mark S. c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | |||
04 /
Howard, Steven J. c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10175461.2 | 24.10.2003 | [2010/52] | Priority number, date | US20020421309P | 25.10.2002 Original published format: US 421309 P | US20030693535 | 23.10.2003 Original published format: US 693535 | [2010/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2267927 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2267927 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2267927 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/08, H04B7/06, H04B7/04, // H04L27/26, H04L25/02, H04L1/00, H04L25/03 | [2012/49] | CPC: |
H04L5/0048 (EP,US);
H04B7/0417 (EP,US);
H04B7/0617 (EP,US);
H04B7/0626 (EP,US);
H04B7/0628 (EP,US);
H04B7/0669 (EP,US);
H04B7/0697 (EP,US);
H04B7/0854 (EP,US);
H04B7/0871 (EP,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,US);
H04L1/0009 (EP,US);
H04L1/0017 (EP,US);
H04L25/0248 (EP,US);
H04L25/03955 (EP,US);
H04L5/0028 (EP,US);
H04L25/0226 (EP,US);
H04L25/0256 (EP,US);
H04L25/03968 (EP,US);
H04L5/0023 (EP,US);
H04L5/006 (EP,US);
H04W16/28 (EP,US);
H04W52/50 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/20] | H04L1/00, H04B7/06, H04B7/08 | ||
Former IPC [2010/52] | H04L1/06, H04L1/00, H04B7/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/52] | Title | German: | Multimode-Endgerät in einem drahtlosen Mimo-System | [2010/52] | English: | Multi-mode terminal in a wireless MIMO system | [2010/52] | French: | Terminal multi-mode dans un système mimo sans fil | [2010/52] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/37] | 16.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03781558.6 / EP1556980 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030781558) is 18.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.10.2003 | AT | 12.03.2014 | BE | 12.03.2014 | CY | 12.03.2014 | CZ | 12.03.2014 | DK | 12.03.2014 | EE | 12.03.2014 | ES | 12.03.2014 | FI | 12.03.2014 | IT | 12.03.2014 | MC | 12.03.2014 | NL | 12.03.2014 | RO | 12.03.2014 | SE | 12.03.2014 | SI | 12.03.2014 | SK | 12.03.2014 | TR | 12.03.2014 | BG | 12.06.2014 | GR | 13.06.2014 | PT | 14.07.2014 | IE | 24.10.2014 | LU | 24.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | FR | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/28] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
IE | 24.10.2014 | ||
LU | 24.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
IE | 24.10.2014 | ||
LU | 24.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
LU | 24.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
LU | 24.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
LU | 24.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
LU | 24.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
LU | 24.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0011823 (RADIX TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [I] 1-17 * page 14 * * figure 8 * * claims 1-7 *; | [I]US6067290 (PAULRAJ AROGYASWAMI J [US], et al) [I] 1-17 * column 24 * * figures 12A,12B,13A,13B * * claims 1-11 *; | [I]CN1298266 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [I] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [I]WO0171928 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [I] 1-17 * figures 1,3-6 * * claims 1,19 *; | [I]EP1185001 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA]) [I] 1-17 * abstract * * figures 1,5 * * claim 1 *; | US6754512 [ ] (IINUMA TOSHINORI [JP]) [ ] * abstract * * figures 3,4 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A] - SAMPATH H ET AL, "Joint transmit and receive optimization for high data rate wireless communication using multiple antennas", SIGNALS, SYSTEMS, AND COMPUTERS, 1999. CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE THIRTY 19991024; 19991024 - 19991027 PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19991024), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/ACSSC.1999.832325, ISBN 978-0-7803-5700-6, pages 215 - 219, XP010373976 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.1999.832325 | [A] - HEMANTH SAMPATH ET AL, "A Fourth-Generation MIMO-OFDM Broadband Wireless System: Design, Performance, and Field Trial Results", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20020901), vol. 40, no. 9, doi:10.1109/MCOM.2002.1031841, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 143 - 149, XP011092922 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2002.1031841 |