EP2260828 - Dental Fillers, Methods, Compositions Including a Caseinate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Co. 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2010/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rusin, Richard P. c/o 3M Center PO Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-342 / US | 02 /
Mitra, Sumita B. c/o 3M Center PO Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-342 / US | 03 /
Cummings, Kevin M. c/o 3M Center PO Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-342 / US | 04 /
Burgio, Paul A. c/o 3M Center PO Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-342 / US | 05 /
Falsafi, Afshin c/o 3M Center PO Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-342 / US | [2015/32] |
Former [2010/50] | 01 /
Rusin, Richard P. c/o 3M Center PO Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-342 / US | ||
02 /
Mitra, Sumita B. c/o 3M Center PO Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-342 / US | |||
03 /
Cummings, Kevin M. c/o 3M Center PO Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-342 / US | |||
04 /
Burgio, Paul A. c/o 3M Center PO Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-342 / US | |||
05 /
Falsafi, Afshin c/o 3M Center PO Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-342 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2015/32] |
Former [2010/50] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10175466.1 | 07.11.2005 | [2010/50] | Priority number, date | US20040989523 | 16.11.2004 Original published format: US 989523 | [2010/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2260828 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2260828 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2260828 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/027, A61K6/083 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
A61K6/62 (EP,US);
A61K8/30 (KR);
A61K6/887 (EP,US);
A61K6/20 (EP,US);
A61K6/30 (EP,US);
A61K6/40 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K6/20, C08L33/08 (US,EP);
A61K6/20, C08L33/10 (US,EP);
A61K6/30, C08L33/08 (US,EP);
A61K6/30, C08L33/10 (US,EP);
A61K6/40, C08L33/08 (EP,US);
A61K6/40, C08L33/10 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/32] |
Former [2010/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dentalfüllstoffe, Verfahren, Zusammensetzungen mit einem Caseinat | [2010/50] | English: | Dental Fillers, Methods, Compositions Including a Caseinate | [2010/50] | French: | Charges dentaires, procédés, compositions incluant un caseinate | [2010/50] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/45] | 23.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05817568.8 / EP1811944 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050817568) is 27.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.11.2005 | AT | 05.08.2015 | BE | 05.08.2015 | BG | 05.08.2015 | CY | 05.08.2015 | CZ | 05.08.2015 | DK | 05.08.2015 | EE | 05.08.2015 | ES | 05.08.2015 | FI | 05.08.2015 | IT | 05.08.2015 | LT | 05.08.2015 | LV | 05.08.2015 | MC | 05.08.2015 | NL | 05.08.2015 | PL | 05.08.2015 | RO | 05.08.2015 | SE | 05.08.2015 | SI | 05.08.2015 | SK | 05.08.2015 | TR | 05.08.2015 | GR | 06.11.2015 | GB | 07.11.2015 | IE | 07.11.2015 | LU | 07.11.2015 | FR | 30.11.2015 | IS | 05.12.2015 | PT | 07.12.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
GB | 07.11.2015 | ||
IE | 07.11.2015 | ||
LU | 07.11.2015 | ||
FR | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
GB | 07.11.2015 | ||
IE | 07.11.2015 | ||
LU | 07.11.2015 | ||
FR | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
GB | 07.11.2015 | ||
IE | 07.11.2015 | ||
LU | 07.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IE | 07.11.2015 | ||
LU | 07.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
LU | 07.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
LU | 07.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 05.08.2015 | |
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 05.08.2015 | |
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 05.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3926870 (KEEGAN JAMES J, et al) [X] 1-9,14,15 * column 2, line 39 - line 55 * * example - *; | [X]WO8707615 (UNIV MELBOURNE [AU], et al) [X] 1,3-15 * page 1, line 2 - line 27 * * page 2, line 24 - line 26 * * page 5, line 24 - line 28 * * examples 21-23 *; | [A]US5135396 (KUBOKI YOSHINORI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 38 - line 43 * * column 3, line 43 - line 64 * * examples 3,6,9,11 ** claim - *; | [X]WO9736943 (NULITE SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL P [AU], et al) [X] 1,3-9,12-15 * page 2, line 7 - page 3, line 2 * * example 3 *; | [X]WO0249578 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [X] 1,6-14 * claim - *; | [A] - MAZZAOUI, S.A.; BURROW, M.F.; TYAS, M.J.; DASHPER, S.G.; EAKINS, D.; REYNOLDS, E.C., "Incorporation of casein phosphopeptide-amorphous calcium phosphate into a glass ionomer cement", JOURNAL OF DENTAL RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 82, no. 11, pages 914 - 918, XP002365530 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | US3786116 | US3842059 | US4259075 | US4298738 | US4324744 | US4356296 | US4385109 | US4499251 | US4503169 | US4537940 | US4539382 | EP0173567 | EP0201031 | EP0201778 | US4642126 | US4648843 | US4652274 | US4695251 | US4710523 | US4737593 | US4871786 | US4872936 | EP0373384 | US5076844 | US5130347 | US5154762 | US5332429 | US5468477 | US5501727 | EP0712622 | US5525648 | US5530038 | US5545676 | US5607663 | US5662887 | US5725882 | US5866630 | US5876208 | US5888491 | US5980697 | US6030606 | WO0038619 | WO0042092 | EP1051961 | WO0107444 | WO0130307 | US6251963 | US6306926 | US6312668 | WO0192271 | US6387981 | US6458868 | US6572693 | WO03063804 | US6613812 | US2003166737 | US2003166740 | US2003195273 | US6730156 | - RIBADEAUDUMAS ET AL., EUR. J BIOCHEM., (1972), vol. 25, page 505 | - MCKENZIE, ADVAN. PROTEIN CHEM., (1967), vol. 22, pages 75 - 135 | - YAMASHITA ET AL., POLYMER J., (1982), vol. 14, page 913 | - ACS POLYMER PREPRINTS, (1984), vol. 25, no. 1, page 245 | - MAKROMOL. CHEM., (1984), vol. 185, page 9 | US20020437106 | US20040847781 | US20040847782 | US20040847803 | US20040600658 |