EP2299388 - Apparatus and method for detecting face [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 09.11.2022 [2022/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Dong-Ryeol 109-502 Samsung Raemian 1 cha Apt., Haengrim Maeul Gisan-dong, Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Yeon-Ho 201-1601 Sinyeongtong Hyundai 2cha Apt., Banwol-dong, Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/12] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 10175480.2 | 06.09.2010 | [2011/12] | Priority number, date | KR20090084015 | 07.09.2009 Original published format: KR 20090084015 | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2299388 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2299388 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/32, G06T7/00, G06K9/00 | [2012/45] | CPC: |
G06V40/161 (EP,US);
G06T7/40 (KR);
G06F18/00 (KR);
H04N7/18 (US)
|
Former IPC [2011/12] | G06K9/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Gesichtsdetektion | [2011/12] | English: | Apparatus and method for detecting face | [2011/12] | French: | Appareil et procédé de détection de visage | [2011/12] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 18.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/45] | 06.04.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.09.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/45] | Appeal following examination | 07.06.2018 | Appeal received No. T1629/18 | 14.06.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.09.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 19.09.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6658136 (BRUMITT BARRETT L [US]) [I] 1-6 * column 2, line 12 - column 3, line 21 * * abstract *; | [I]US2006126941 (HIGAKI NOBUO [JP]) [I] 1-6 * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0239] *; | [I] - DAVID BEYMER , KURT KONOLIGE, "Real-Time Tracking of Multiple People Using Continuous Detection", (19990101), URL: http://citeseerx.ist.psu.edu/viewdoc/download?doi=10.1.1.46.7987&rep=rep1&type=pdf, (20120926), XP002684338 [I] 1-6 * section 3-5 * * figures 1-8 * |