EP2292225 - Dosage form comprising taxol in crystalline form [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 13.01.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2020 | Revocation of patent | published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOSTON SCIENTIFIC SCIMED LIMITED The Corporate Centre Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael / BB | [2011/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunz, Lawrence, L. 2114 W.Dry Creek Road Ellensburg, WA 98926 / US | 02 /
Klein, Richard, A. 20311 Maplewood Drive Edmonds, WA 98026 / US | 03 /
Reno, John, M. 2452 Elm Drive Brier, WA 98036 / US | [2012/19] |
Former [2011/10] | 01 /
Kunz, Lawrence, L. 2114 W.Dry Creek Road Ellensburg, WA 98926 / US | ||
02 /
Klein, Richard, A. 20311 Maplewood Drive Edmonds, WA 98026 / US | |||
03 /
Reno, John, M. 2452 Elm Drive Brier, WA 98036 / US | Representative(s) | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Straße 3 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/10] | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. HighLight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10175858.9 | 31.03.1998 | [2011/10] | Priority number, date | US19970829685 | 31.03.1997 Original published format: US 829685 | US19970827991 | 31.03.1997 Original published format: US 827991 | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2292225 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2292225 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2292225 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/335, A61L31/16, A61P7/00, A61F2/06, A61K31/16 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
A61K31/403 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP);
A61K31/04 (EP);
A61K31/131 (EP);
A61K31/135 (EP);
A61K31/138 (EP);
A61K31/165 (EP);
A61K31/17 (EP);
A61K31/337 (EP);
A61K31/352 (EP);
A61K31/365 (EP);
A61K31/40 (EP);
A61K31/4025 (EP);
A61K31/4035 (EP);
A61K31/407 (EP);
A61K31/519 (EP);
A61K31/551 (EP);
A61K31/704 (EP);
A61K47/34 (EP);
A61K47/51 (EP);
A61K47/6803 (EP,US);
A61K47/6809 (EP);
A61K47/6817 (EP);
A61K47/6831 (EP);
A61K47/6843 (EP);
A61K47/6923 (EP);
A61K47/6927 (EP);
A61K9/0024 (EP);
A61K9/0051 (EP);
A61L31/08 (EP);
A61L31/148 (EP);
A61L31/16 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
A61L2300/416 (EP);
A61L2300/432 (EP);
A61L2300/602 (EP);
A61L2300/606 (EP);
A61L2300/622 (EP);
A61L2300/63 (EP);
G01N2800/323 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2011/10] | Title | German: | Darreichungsform enthaltend Taxol in kristalliner Form | [2011/10] | English: | Dosage form comprising taxol in crystalline form | [2011/10] | French: | Forme de dosage comprénant du taxol en forme cristalline | [2011/10] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2010 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 27.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.11.2014 | Observations by third parties | 28.11.2014 | Observations by third parties | 11.08.2016 | Observations by third parties | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04023674.7 / EP1512398 | EP09004768.9 / EP2098230 | EP98914366.4 / EP0975340 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980914366) is 21.08.2001 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.02.2013
12.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 44-1, Hatagaya 2-Chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP Opponent's representative Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte, et al, et al Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.02.2013
12.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 44-1, Hatagaya 2-Chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP Opponent's representative Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys, et al, et al Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 21.03.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.09.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.12.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.01.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.01.2015 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 09.09.2019 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/08] | 19.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 13.03.2015 | Appeal received No. T0548/15 | 05.06.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.09.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 09.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.09.2019 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.05.2012 | BE | 09.05.2012 | DK | 09.05.2012 | FI | 09.05.2012 | IT | 09.05.2012 | SE | 09.05.2012 | GR | 10.08.2012 | PT | 10.09.2012 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | LU | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | GB | 31.03.2015 | IE | 31.03.2018 | [2018/35] |
Former [2016/07] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
LU | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
GB | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
LU | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | FI | 09.05.2012 | |
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 09.05.2012 | |
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 09.05.2012 | |
SE | 09.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9211890 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]); | [X]WO9416706 (NEORX CORP [US]); | [X]WO9625176 (NEORX CORP [US], et al); | by applicant | JPS471925B | JPS4714219B | JPS478533B | JPS4723394B | JPS471924B | JPS474164B | US4093709 | US4389330 | US4512762 | JPS61268687 | JPS62120388 | US4675189 | JPS62155284 | JPS62155285 | JPS62164626 | JPS62240689 | US4744981 | WO8807045 | JPS63295589 | JPS63295988 | EP0296110 | WO8810259 | US4824436 | US4835002 | JPH01143877 | JPH01149791 | EP0323171 | WO8907105 | JPH01246288 | US4879225 | JPH029819 | US4897255 | US4906452 | WO9001969 | WO9003768 | US4929602 | US4935415 | JPH02258724 | WO9013293 | EP0410389 | EP0411893 | JPH0372485 | US5015578 | WO9109034 | US5049132 | JPH03220194 | US5213576 | US5232444 | WO9317121 | US5282785 | WO9408604 | WO9408605 | US5328471 | WO9419000 | WO9419001 | WO9419003 | US5362424 | US5364632 | EP0639577 | US5407609 | WO9520582 | US5458568 | US5478860 | US19950389712 | other | WO9745105 | US2010272773 | US2011015664 | DE102011100122 | US8439868 |