EP2296318 - Method and apparatus for monitoring packet networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symmetricom, Inc. 2300 Orchard Parkway San Jose, CA 95131-1017 / US | [2011/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Darras, Samer H. 1218 Rousseau Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 02 /
Cole, Steven R. 1313 Maria Way San Jose, CA 95117 / US | [2011/11] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/11] | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10176019.7 | 09.09.2010 | [2011/11] | Priority number, date | US20090558297 | 11.09.2009 Original published format: US 558297 | [2011/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2296318 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26, H04J3/06 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
H04J3/0673 (EP,US);
H04L43/106 (EP,US);
H04J3/0667 (EP,US);
H04J3/0697 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Überwachung von Paketnetzwerken | [2011/11] | English: | Method and apparatus for monitoring packet networks | [2011/11] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la surveillance de réseaux de paquets | [2011/11] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 16.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 08.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/27] | 04.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0159965 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-15* page 7, line 5 - page 10, line 15 *; | [X]US2002024973 (TAVANA SADREDIN [US], et al) [X] 13 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039]; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US2003235216 (GUSTIN JAY W [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0058]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2006063922 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 7, line 31 *; | [XYI] - XILINX, "Ethernet AVB Endpoint 1.1 DS677 (v1.1.1)", Product Specification, (20081007), pages 1 - 34, URL: http://pdfserv2.datasheetpro.net/242/24209-ion-eth-avb-endpoint-ds677.pdf, (20101101), XP002607982 [X] 1 * page 4 - page 5 * * page 7 - page 9 * [Y] 2-4,8-15 [I] 5-7 | [Y] - XILINX, "LogiCORE Tri-Mode Ethernet MAC v2.1 User Guide UG138", User Guide, (20050428), pages 1 - 138, URL: http://www.decom.fee.unicamp.br/~cardoso/ie344b/tri_mode_eth_mac_ug138.pdf, (20101103), XP002607983 [Y] 2-4,8-15 * page 137 * | Examination | - TEODOR NEAGOE ET AL, "A Hardware IEEE-1588 Implementation with Processor Frequency Control", ARROW WHITE PAPERS, (20060801), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://www.arrownac.com/mktg/resource_mag/august_2006/engineering/hardware_ieee_1588_maher3.pdf, (20111212), XP055014521 | - SVEN MEIER ET AL, "IEEE 1588 syntonization and synchronization functions completely realized in hardware", PRECISION CLOCK SYNCHRONIZATION FOR MEASUREMENT, CONTROL AND COMMUNICATION, 2008. ISPCS 2008. IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080922), ISBN 978-1-4244-2274-6, pages 1 - 4, XP031354119 | - LEE COSART, "STUDYING NETWORK TIMING WITH PRECISION PACKET DELAY MEASUREMENTS", 40TH ANNUAL PRECISE AND TIME INTERVAL (PTTI) MEETING, Reston, VA, USA, (20081204), pages 165 - 186, XP055051614 | - LEE COSART SYMMETRICOM ET AL, "Active Packet Measurement Probe;WD 67", ITU-T DRAFT ; STUDY PERIOD 2005-2008, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA ; CH, (20080916), vol. Q13/15, pages 1 - 6, XP017536835 |