EP2259569 - Photosensor system and drive control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Casio Computer Co., Ltd. 6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8543 / JP | [2010/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Yoshiaki c/o Intellectual Property Department Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Hamura R&D Center 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | 02 /
Koshizuka, Yasuo 1448-1-221, Kumagawa Fussa-shi, Tokyo 197-0003 / JP | [2012/01] |
Former [2011/10] | 01 /
Nakamura, Yoshiaki c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd. IP Department Hamura R&D Center 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | ||
02 /
Koshizuka, Yasuo 1448-1-221, Kumagawa Fussa-shi, Tokyo 197-0003 / JP | |||
Former [2010/49] | 01 /
Nakamura, Yoshiaki 9-7-1-5-402, Kabemachi Ome-shi, Tokyo 198-0036 / JP | ||
02 /
Koshizuka, Yasuo 1448-1-221, Kumagawa Fussa-shi, Tokyo 197-0003 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10176144.3 | 19.10.2000 | [2010/49] | Priority number, date | JP19990316650 | 08.11.1999 Original published format: JP 31665099 | JP19990319605 | 10.11.1999 Original published format: JP 31960599 | JP20000015981 | 25.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000015981 | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2259569 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2259569 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | [2011/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2259569 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/235, H04N5/367, H04N5/353 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
H04N23/71 (EP,KR,US);
H04N25/683 (EP,KR,US);
H04N25/53 (EP,US);
H04N25/533 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/49] | H04N3/15, H04N5/235 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2012/22] |
Former [2010/49] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Ansteuerungsverfahren für Photosensorsystem | [2010/49] | English: | Photosensor system and drive control method thereof | [2010/49] | French: | Système photodétecteur et procédé de commande d'attaque dudit système | [2010/49] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 15.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00969899.4 / EP1142314 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000969899) is 16.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.06.2012 | BE | 06.06.2012 | FI | 06.06.2012 | IT | 06.06.2012 | NL | 06.06.2012 | ES | 17.09.2012 | CH | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | [2013/33] |
Former [2013/22] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 06.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05316432 ; | [A]WO9304556 (VLSI VISION LTD [GB]) |