EP2256280 - Ladder shaped insulating strip for compound profile for window, door and facade elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technoform Bautec Holding GmbH Friedrichsplatz 8 34117 Kassel / DE | [2012/26] |
Former [2011/35] | For all designated states Technoform Bautec Holding GmbH Ostring 4 34277 Fuldabrück / DE | ||
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states Technoform Caprano und Brunnhofer GmbH & Co. KG Ostring 4 34277 Fuldabrück / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siodla, Thosten Gustav-Heinemann-Allee 47 34225 Baunatal / DE | 02 /
Brunnhofer, Erwin Goldene Aue 20 34277 Fuldabrück / DE | [2010/48] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Straße 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10176394.4 | 31.03.2008 | [2010/48] | Priority number, date | DE20072004935U | 02.04.2007 Original published format: DE 202007004935 U | DE20072009106U | 28.06.2007 Original published format: DE 202007009106 U | DE20072016649U | 27.11.2007 Original published format: DE 202007016649 U | [2010/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2256280 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2256280 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/26, // E06B3/263 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
E06B3/26301 (EP,US);
E06B3/26303 (EP,US);
E06B3/26305 (EP,US);
E06B2003/26352 (EP,US);
E06B2003/26361 (EP,US);
E06B2003/26387 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/48] | E06B3/263 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/48] | Title | German: | Leiterförmiger Isoliersteg für ein Verbundprofil für Fenster-, Türen- und Fassadenelemente | [2010/48] | English: | Ladder shaped insulating strip for compound profile for window, door and facade elements | [2010/48] | French: | Ame isolante sous forme d'echelle pour profilés composites pour éléments de fenêtre, de porte ou de façade | [2010/48] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 12.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/44] | 20.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/44] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08734902.3 / EP2044284 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080734902) is 15.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE29621419U (HARTMANN & CO W [DE]) [X] 2 * figure 5 * * page 7, line 14 - page 8, line 9 * * page 9, line 12 - page 10, line 1 *; | [AD]DE19853235 (WICONA BAUSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [XDA]DE19956415 (CAPRANO & BRUNNHOFER [DE]) [XD] 2 * figure 2 *[A] 1; | [AP]DE202007004935U (TECHNOFORM CAPRANO BRUNNHOFER [DE]) [AP] 1-3 * figure 5 * * paragraph [0026] *; | [XP]DE202007009106U (TECHNOFORM CAPRANO BRUNNHOFER [DE]) [XP] 1-3 * figures 5-7 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034] * | Examination | JPH1122313 | by applicant | DE29623019U | DE19735702 | DE19818769 | DE29821183U | DE19853235 | DE19956415 | EP0829609 | EP1004739 |