EP2294936 - Water barrier for footwear [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wolverine Outdoors, Inc. 9341 Courtland Drive, NE Rockford, MI 49351 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | For all designated states Wolverine Outdoors, Inc. 9341 Courtland Drive, NE Rockford MI 49351 / US | ||
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states Wolverine World Wide, Inc. 9341 Courtland Drive N.E. Rockford, Michigan 49351 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakano, Kiyotaka 3881 Windwood Road N.E. Rockford, MI 49341 / US | [2011/11] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/11] | Ruhrmann, Andrea Elizabeth, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10176462.9 | 13.09.2010 | [2011/11] | Priority number, date | US20090558072 | 11.09.2009 Original published format: US 558072 | [2011/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2294936 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A43B7/08, A43B7/12, A43B13/12 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
A43B7/08 (EP,US);
A43B13/125 (EP,US);
A43B17/107 (EP,US);
A43B7/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wassersperre für Schuhe | [2011/11] | English: | Water barrier for footwear | [2011/11] | French: | Barrière imperméable pour chaussures | [2011/11] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 03.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/32] | 03.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008028659 (DEHN MICHAEL CHRISTIAN [DE]) [X] 1-22* the whole document * | Examination | EP1759605 | US2007294923 | US2009203275 | ES2367449T | by applicant | US5071681 | US5451219 | US6701640 |