EP2309408 - Method and system for detection and prediction of computer virus-related epidemics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaspersky Lab, ZAO 39A/3 Leningradskoe Shosse Moscow 125212 / RU | [2013/49] |
Former [2011/15] | For all designated states Kaspersky Lab, ZAO 10 Geroyev Panfilovtsev Street Moscow 125363 / RU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mashevsky, Yuri V. c/o KASPERSKY LAB ZAO 10/1 1st Volokolamsky Proezd Moscow 123060 / RU | 02 /
Namestnikov, Yuri V. c/o KASPERSKY LAB ZAO 10/1 1st Volokolamsky Proezd Moscow 123060 / RU | 03 /
Denishchenko, Nikolay V. c/o KASPERSKY LAB ZAO 10/1 1st Volokolamsky Proezd Moscow 123060 / RU | 04 /
Zelensky, Pavel A c/o KASPERSKY LAB ZAO 10/1 1st Volokolamsky Proezd Moscow 123060 / RU | [2016/32] |
Former [2011/15] | 01 /
Mashevsky, Yuri V. c/o KASPERSKY LAB ZAO 10/1 1st Volokolamsky Proezd 123060, Moscow / RU | ||
02 /
Namestnikov, Yuri V. c/o KASPERSKY LAB ZAO 10/1 1st Volokolamsky Proezd 123060, Moscow / RU | |||
03 /
Denishchenko, Nikolay V. c/o KASPERSKY LAB ZAO 10/1 1st Volokolamsky Proezd 123060, Moscow / RU | |||
04 /
Zelensky, Pavel A c/o KASPERSKY LAB ZAO 10/1 1st Volokolamsky Proezd 123060, Moscow / RU | Representative(s) | Sloboshanin, Sergej, et al V. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck, Hano Mariahilfplatz 3 81541 München / DE | [2011/15] | Application number, filing date | 10176518.8 | 14.09.2010 | [2011/15] | Priority number, date | RU20090136234 | 01.10.2009 Original published format: RU 2009136234 | US20090631830 | 06.12.2009 Original published format: US 631830 | [2011/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2309408 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2309408 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/56, H04L29/06, // G06F21/55 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
G06F21/552 (EP,US);
G06F21/562 (EP,US);
H04L63/145 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/15] | G06F21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2011/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 12.05.2011 | ME | 12.05.2011 | RS | 12.05.2011 | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Erkennung und Vorhersage einer computervirusbezogenen Epidemie | [2011/15] | English: | Method and system for detection and prediction of computer virus-related epidemics | [2011/15] | French: | Procédé et système pour la détection et la prédiction d'épidémies se rapportant aux virus informatiques | [2011/15] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 25.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.09.2010 | AL | 10.08.2016 | AT | 10.08.2016 | BE | 10.08.2016 | CY | 10.08.2016 | CZ | 10.08.2016 | DK | 10.08.2016 | EE | 10.08.2016 | ES | 10.08.2016 | FI | 10.08.2016 | HR | 10.08.2016 | IT | 10.08.2016 | LT | 10.08.2016 | LV | 10.08.2016 | MC | 10.08.2016 | MK | 10.08.2016 | NL | 10.08.2016 | PL | 10.08.2016 | RO | 10.08.2016 | SE | 10.08.2016 | SI | 10.08.2016 | SK | 10.08.2016 | SM | 10.08.2016 | TR | 10.08.2016 | IE | 14.09.2016 | LU | 14.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | MT | 30.09.2016 | BG | 10.11.2016 | NO | 10.11.2016 | GR | 11.11.2016 | IS | 10.12.2016 | PT | 12.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 14.09.2010 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MK | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
TR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.09.2016 | ||
LU | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 14.09.2010 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MK | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
TR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.09.2016 | ||
LU | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 14.09.2010 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MK | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.09.2016 | ||
LU | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.09.2016 | ||
LU | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 10.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2006259967 (THOMAS ANIL F [US], et al) [I] 1-7,15 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0014] , [0031] , [0043] , [0049] , [0054] , [0055] , [0062] * * figure 6 * [Y] 8-14; | [Y]EP1835429 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 8-14 * paragraphs [0010] , [0017] , [0018] , [0054] *; | [IA]EP1708114 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [I] 1,2,7 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] , [0029] , [0030] , [0038] , [0040] * * figure 4 * [A] 3-6,8-15; | [A]US2007300300 (GUO JINHONG K [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0013] , [0014] , [0015] , [0037] *; | [A]US7530106 (ZAITSEV OLEG V [RU], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 3 * * column 5, line 4 - column 5, line 49 * * column 8, line 1 - column 8, line 5 * * figure 1 * | [A] - SELLKE S ET AL, "Modeling and Automated Containment of Worms", DEPENDABLE SYSTEMS AND NETWORKS, 2005. DSN 2005. PROCEEDINGS. INTERNAT IONAL CONFERENCE ON YOKOHAMA, JAPAN 28-01 JUNE 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050628), doi:10.1109/DSN.2005.66, ISBN 978-0-7695-2282-1, pages 528 - 537, XP010817829 [A] 8-14 * abstract * * Section 1, 2, 3.3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DSN.2005.66 | Examination | US2004205419 | US2005086526 | US2007174911 | by applicant | WO2007066333 | US2008134335 | US2006259967 | US2006236392 | US7418732 | US2009064332 | US2006070130 |