EP2305587 - Method for folding a flat or gusseted tubolar sheet of flexible material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soragni S.r.l. Via Nino Bixio 27 46012 Bozzolo (Mantova) / IT | [2011/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Soragni, Luciano SORAGNI S.r.l. Via Nino Bixio 27 46012, BOZZOLO (MANTOVA) / IT | 02 /
Soragni, Matteo SORAGNI S.r.l. Via Nino Bixio 27 46012, BOZZOLO (MANTOVA) / IT | [2012/30] |
Former [2011/14] | 01 /
Soragni, Luciano SORAGNI S.r.l. Via Nino Bixio 27 46012, BOZZOLO (MANTOVA) / IT | ||
02 /
Soragni, Matteo SORAGNI S.r.l. Via Nino Bixio 27 46012, BOZZOLO (MANTOVA) / IT | Representative(s) | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. Largo Michele Novaro, 1/A 43121 Parma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. Largo Michele Novaro, 1/A 43121 Parma / IT | ||
Former [2011/14] | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. Largo Michele Novaro, 1/A 43121 Parma / IT | Application number, filing date | 10176650.9 | 14.09.2010 | [2011/14] | Priority number, date | IT2009PR00075 | 30.09.2009 Original published format: IT PR20090075 | [2011/14] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2305587 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2305587 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65H45/08, B65H45/22, B65H45/28 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
B65H45/08 (EP);
B65H45/22 (EP);
B65H45/28 (EP);
B65H2701/1752 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Falten einer flachen oder Seitenfalten aufweisenden schlauchförmigen Bahn aus flexiblem Material | [2011/14] | English: | Method for folding a flat or gusseted tubolar sheet of flexible material | [2011/14] | French: | Procédé destiné à plier des feuilles tubulaires planes ou à soufflets d'un matériau flexible | [2011/14] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 09.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.09.2010 | AL | 25.07.2012 | AT | 25.07.2012 | BE | 25.07.2012 | CY | 25.07.2012 | CZ | 25.07.2012 | DK | 25.07.2012 | EE | 25.07.2012 | FI | 25.07.2012 | HR | 25.07.2012 | LT | 25.07.2012 | LV | 25.07.2012 | MK | 25.07.2012 | MT | 25.07.2012 | NL | 25.07.2012 | PL | 25.07.2012 | RO | 25.07.2012 | SE | 25.07.2012 | SI | 25.07.2012 | SK | 25.07.2012 | SM | 25.07.2012 | TR | 25.07.2012 | IE | 14.09.2012 | LU | 14.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | BG | 25.10.2012 | NO | 25.10.2012 | GR | 26.10.2012 | ES | 05.11.2012 | IS | 25.11.2012 | PT | 26.11.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 14.09.2010 | |
AL | 25.07.2012 | ||
AT | 25.07.2012 | ||
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
MT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
SM | 25.07.2012 | ||
TR | 25.07.2012 | ||
IE | 14.09.2012 | ||
LU | 14.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AL | 25.07.2012 | |
AT | 25.07.2012 | ||
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
MT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
SM | 25.07.2012 | ||
TR | 25.07.2012 | ||
IE | 14.09.2012 | ||
LU | 14.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AL | 25.07.2012 | |
AT | 25.07.2012 | ||
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
MT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
TR | 25.07.2012 | ||
IE | 14.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AL | 25.07.2012 | |
AT | 25.07.2012 | ||
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
MT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
IE | 14.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
IE | 14.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
IE | 14.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
HR | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 25.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4948638 (FRANCIS MICHAEL A [US]) [AD] 1 * column 1, line 15 - column 2, line 15 * * column 3; figures 4-6 *; | [AD]GB2442722 (FADAII KHANDAN [GB], et al) [AD] 1 * page 2, line 10 - page 3, line 25 * * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 16; figures 1a-1f * | by applicant | US4948638 | GB2442722 |