EP2264197 - Metal compound removal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF CORPORATION 100 Campus Drive Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US | [2010/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brandts, Jim Aloysius Maria Oosterstraat 26 2611 TW, Delft / NL | 02 /
Berben, Pieter Hildegardus Vinkenbuurt 12 3951 CZ, Maarn / NL | [2013/03] |
Former [2010/51] | 01 /
Brandts, Jim Aloysius Maria Oosterstraat 26 2611 TW, Delft / NL | ||
02 /
Berben, Pieter Hildegardus Vinkenbuurt 12 3951 CZ, Maarn / NL | Representative(s) | Hatzmann, Martin V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Hatzmann, Martin Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2010/51] | Hatzmann, Martin Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 10176690.5 | 07.07.2003 | [2010/51] | Priority number, date | EP20020077760 | 08.07.2002 Original published format: EP 02077760 | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2264197 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2264197 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C22B11/00, C22B7/00, C22B3/06 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
C02F1/5236 (EP,US);
C22B11/00 (KR);
C22B11/042 (EP,US);
C22B11/048 (EP,US);
C22B3/06 (KR);
C22B7/00 (KR);
C22B7/007 (EP,US);
C02F1/288 (EP,US);
C02F2101/20 (EP,US);
C02F2101/303 (EP,US);
C02F2101/308 (EP,US);
C02F2103/32 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/51] | Title | German: | Abtrennung von Metallverbindungen | [2010/51] | English: | Metal compound removal | [2010/51] | French: | Extraction de composés de métal | [2010/51] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 17.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03763392.2 / EP1537247 | EP07115012.2 / EP1876247 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030763392) is 17.08.2005 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.01.2013 | CY | 16.01.2013 | CZ | 16.01.2013 | EE | 16.01.2013 | MC | 16.01.2013 | RO | 16.01.2013 | SI | 16.01.2013 | SK | 16.01.2013 | TR | 16.01.2013 | BG | 16.04.2013 | GR | 17.04.2013 | PT | 16.05.2013 | IE | 07.07.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/33] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
IE | 07.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BG | 16.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU1036775 ; | [A]US3485763 (LEFEVRE JEAN, et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract; Col.4, lines 21-52 *; | [A]US4272400 (SILBERNAGEL BERNARD G, et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]DD268166 (AKAD WISSENSCHAFTEN DDR [DD]) [A] 1-15 * claims *; | [A]WO0029107 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 12 - page 6, line 10 *; | [A]EP1080784 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 6, lines 24-28; page 5, lines 40-41 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1984, no. 21, Database accession no. 1984-131937, XP002224828 & SU1036775 A 19830823 (URALS KIROV POLY) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | US4353810 | US4413118 | US4429057 | US4855400 | US4950629 | US4952304 | US6187962 | US6303829 | US6307108 | - CATALYSIS LETTERS, (1990), vol. 6, pages 417 - 422 | - KING ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1992), vol. 57, pages 6689 - 6691 |