EP2264880 - Automatically controlled synchronous rectifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEG Power Solutions B.V. Weerenweg 29 1161 AH Zwanenburg / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states AEG Power Solutions B.V. Weerenweg 29 1161 AG Zwanenburg / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diallo, Almadidi 3, Allée Honoré de Balzac 35235, Thorigne-Fouillard / FR | 02 /
Puisieux, Philippe 13, rue René Cassin 22300, Lannion / FR | 03 /
Ceunebrock, Patrick 2bis, cote de Boudilléo 22560, Pleumeur Bodou / FR | [2010/51] | Representative(s) | David, Alain, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | David, Alain, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10176750.7 | 29.04.2002 | [2010/51] | Priority number, date | FR20010008336 | 25.06.2001 Original published format: FR 0108336 | FR20010014792 | 15.11.2001 Original published format: FR 0114792 | [2010/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2264880 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2264880 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
H02M1/38 (EP,US);
H02M3/33592 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2010/51] | Title | German: | Automatisch gesteuerter Synchrongleichrichter | [2010/51] | English: | Automatically controlled synchronous rectifier | [2010/51] | French: | Redresseur synchrone auto-commandé | [2010/51] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 27.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/14] | 01.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02291075.6 / EP1276217 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020291075) is 03.11.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE3927734 (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * figures 9-11 * * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 52 * [I] 5-10; | [X]US6181579 (NAGAI JUN [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 6 * * column 11, line 21 - column 12, line 20 *; | [X]US6191965 (MATSUMOTO AKIRA [JP]) [X] 1,2 * figure 5 * * column 11, line 49 - column 12, line 41 * |