EP2256952 - Method and apparatus for utilizing channel state information in a wireless communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive, R-132 D San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2010/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ling, Funyun 17264 Sangallo Lane San Diego, CA 92127 / US | 02 /
Walton, Jay R. 85 Highwoods Lane Carlisle, MA 01741 / US | 03 /
Howard, Steven J. 75 Heritage Avenue Ashland, MA 01721 / US | 04 /
Wallace, Mark 4 Madel Lane Bedford, MA 01730 / US | 05 /
Ketchum, John W. 37 Candleberry Lane Harvard, MA 01451 / US | [2019/47] |
Former [2010/48] | 01 /
Ling, Funyun 17264 Sangallo Lane San Diego, CA 92127 / US | ||
02 /
Walton, Jay R. 85 Highwoods Lane Carlisle, MA 01741 / US | |||
03 /
Howard, Steven J. 75 Heritage Avenue Ashland, MA 01721 / US | |||
04 /
Wallace, Mark 4 Madel Lane Bedford, MA 01730 / US | |||
05 /
Ketchum, John W. 37 Candleberry Lane Harvard, MA 01451 / US | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [2019/47] |
Former [2010/48] | Reedy, Orlaith, et al Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 10176952.9 | 22.03.2002 | [2010/48] | Priority number, date | US20010816481 | 23.03.2001 Original published format: US 816481 | [2010/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2256952 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2256952 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2256952 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/0417, H04B7/06, H04B7/08, H04L1/00, H04L5/00, H04L25/02, H04L25/03 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
H04B7/0417 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0626 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0632 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0854 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0891 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0009 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0015 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,KR,US);
H04L25/0204 (EP,KR,US);
H04L25/021 (EP,KR,US);
H04L25/0244 (EP,US);
H04L25/0248 (EP,US);
H04L25/03159 (EP,US);
H04L25/03343 (EP,US);
H04L5/0023 (EP,US);
H04L5/0044 (EP,US);
H04L5/006 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03414 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03426 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03802 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/35] | H04B7/08, H04B7/06, H04L1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2010/48] | H04B7/08, H04B7/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2019/47] |
Former [2010/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Nutzung von Kanalstatusinformation in einem drahtlosen Kommunikationssystem | [2010/48] | English: | Method and apparatus for utilizing channel state information in a wireless communication system | [2010/48] | French: | Procédé et appareil d'utilisation d'information d'état de canal dans un système de communication sans fil | [2010/48] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 06.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02753807.3 / EP1371147 | EP07103174.4 / EP1786118 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020753807) is 31.08.2005 | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 08.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.11.2019 | MC | 20.11.2019 | LU | 22.03.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/04] | MC | 20.11.2019 | |
LU | 22.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | MC | 20.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9809381 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * page 5, line 34 - page 7, line 34 * * page 15, line 26 - page 19, line 4 * * claims 1-3 * * figure 7 *; | [XI]EP1079543 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 8,9,16,18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0059] * * figures 2-5 * [I] 1-7,10-15,17; | [A] - JOENGREN G ET AL, "UTILIZING QUANTIZED FEEDBACK INFORMATION IN ORTHOGONAL SPACE-TIME BLOCK CODING", GLOBECOM'00. 2000 IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. SAN FRANCISCO, CA, NOV. 27 - DEC. 1, 2000, IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20001127), VOL. 2 OF 4, ISBN 0-7803-6452-X, pages 995 - 999, XP001017234 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | by applicant | - P.W. WOLNIANSK ET AL., "V-BLAST: An Architecture for Achieving Very High Data Rates over the Rich-Scattering Wireless Channel", PROC. ISSSE-98 | US20000532492 | US20010776073 |