EP2292184 - Implantable stent prosthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited P.O. Box 317 Seaston House Hastings Christ Church / BB | [2011/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, Dachuan 11274 49th Avenue North Plymouth MN 55442 / US | 02 /
Stanslaski, Joel L. 4016 Ensign Avenue North New Hope MN 55427 / US | 03 /
Wang, Lixiao 12822 86th Place North Maple Grove MN 55369 / US | 04 /
Smith, Scott R. 6950 County Road 10 Chaska MN 55318 / US | [2011/10] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/10] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10177262.2 | 06.06.2000 | [2011/10] | Priority number, date | US19990346975 | 02.07.1999 Original published format: US 346975 | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2292184 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2292184 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/10, A61L31/16, A61K9/00 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
A61K9/0024 (EP,US);
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61F2/91 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0067 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L31/10, C08L67/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/10] | A61F2/06, A61P35/00, A61K9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, NL [2011/10] | Title | German: | Implantierbare Stentprothese | [2011/10] | English: | Implantable stent prosthesis | [2011/10] | French: | Endoprothèse vasculaire implantable | [2011/10] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 15.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00943431.7 / EP1107707 | EP06024312.8 / EP1757250 | EP09005881.9 / EP2092913 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000943431) is 10.02.2004 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 06.06.2013 | FR | 01.07.2013 | [2014/24] |
Former [2014/21] | GB | 06.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO9856312 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [AD] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9921908 (ANGIOTECH PHARM INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 3, line 7 - line 11 * * page 14, line 18 - page 15, line 16 * * page 50 - page 53; example 5 * * page 69 - page 70; example 13 *; | [X]US5714159 (SHALABY SHALABY W [US]) [X] 1 * column 12, line 28 - line 33 * | by applicant | US5476909 | US5548035 | US5470829 | US19970874190 |