EP2305788 - Cleaning composition, cleaning process, and process for producing semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/14] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Tomonori c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-ch Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Kazutaka c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-ch Shizuoka / JP | 03 /
Mizutani, Atsushi c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-ch Shizuoka / JP | 04 /
Seki, Hiroyuki c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-ch Shizuoka / JP | 05 /
Fushimi, Hideo c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-ch Shizuoka / JP | 06 /
Kato, Tomoo c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-ch Shizuoka / JP | [2014/29] |
Former [2011/14] | 01 /
Takahashi, Tomonori c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-ch Shizuoka / JP | ||
02 /
Takahashi, Kazutaka c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-ch Shizuoka / JP | |||
03 /
Mizutani, Atsushi c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-ch Shizuoka / JP | |||
04 /
Seki, Hiroyuki c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-ch Shizuoka / JP | |||
05 /
Fushimi, Hideo c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-ch Shizuoka / JP | |||
06 /
Kato, Tomoo c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-ch Shizuoka / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/29] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/14] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10177316.6 | 17.09.2010 | [2011/14] | Priority number, date | JP20090226698 | 30.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009226698 | JP20100116623 | 20.05.2010 Original published format: JP 2010116623 | [2011/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2305788 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2305788 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C11D11/00, C11D7/50, C11D7/08 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
C11D7/08 (EP,US);
C11D1/835 (CN);
G03F7/425 (US);
C09K13/00 (US);
C09K13/06 (US);
C11D3/0073 (CN);
C11D3/046 (CN);
C11D3/048 (CN);
C11D3/2044 (CN);
C11D3/2068 (CN);
C11D3/28 (CN);
C11D7/265 (US);
C11D7/3209 (US);
C11D7/3245 (US);
C11D7/34 (US);
C11D7/5013 (EP,US);
G03F7/422 (US);
G03F7/423 (US);
H01L21/02052 (US);
H01L21/02057 (CN,US);
H01L21/02063 (EP,US);
H01L21/02068 (US);
H01L21/02071 (EP,US);
H01L21/31133 (EP,US);
H01L21/32134 (US);
H01L21/32136 (US);
H01L21/32138 (EP,US);
H01L21/32139 (US);
C11D1/08 (CN);
C11D1/10 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/14] | Title | German: | Reinigungszusammensetzung, Reinigungsverfahren und Herstellungsverfahren für eine Halbleitervorrichtung | [2011/14] | English: | Cleaning composition, cleaning process, and process for producing semiconductor device | [2011/14] | French: | Composition de nettoyage, procédé de nettoyage et procédé pour la production d'un dispositif semi-conducteur | [2011/14] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/46] | 24.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.09.2010 | AL | 16.07.2014 | AT | 16.07.2014 | CY | 16.07.2014 | CZ | 16.07.2014 | DK | 16.07.2014 | EE | 16.07.2014 | ES | 16.07.2014 | FI | 16.07.2014 | HR | 16.07.2014 | IT | 16.07.2014 | LT | 16.07.2014 | LV | 16.07.2014 | MC | 16.07.2014 | MK | 16.07.2014 | MT | 16.07.2014 | NL | 16.07.2014 | PL | 16.07.2014 | RO | 16.07.2014 | SE | 16.07.2014 | SI | 16.07.2014 | SK | 16.07.2014 | SM | 16.07.2014 | TR | 16.07.2014 | IE | 17.09.2014 | LU | 17.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | BG | 16.10.2014 | GB | 16.10.2014 | NO | 16.10.2014 | GR | 17.10.2014 | IS | 16.11.2014 | PT | 17.11.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 17.09.2010 | |
AT | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
MK | 16.07.2014 | ||
MT | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
SM | 16.07.2014 | ||
TR | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 17.09.2014 | ||
LU | 17.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GB | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 17.09.2010 | |
AT | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
MT | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
SM | 16.07.2014 | ||
TR | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 17.09.2014 | ||
LU | 17.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GB | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 17.09.2010 | |
AT | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
MT | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
SM | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 17.09.2014 | ||
LU | 17.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GB | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
MT | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
SM | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 17.09.2014 | ||
LU | 17.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GB | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
SM | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 17.09.2014 | ||
LU | 17.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GB | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 17.09.2014 | ||
LU | 17.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GB | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 17.09.2014 | ||
LU | 17.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GB | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 17.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GB | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 17.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 17.09.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 17.09.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 16.07.2014 | |
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 16.07.2014 | |
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 16.07.2014 | |
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 16.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2007003617 ; | [XY]WO9836045 (EKC TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-11,15-19 * composition B in table III *;; examples 1, 2; claims 1-4; table III * * page 10, line 10 - page 12, line 3 * [Y] 1-19; | [X]WO9840453 (EKC TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7,15-19 * compositions G, H *;; claim -; table 1 *; | [Y]WO9915345 (OLIN MICROELECTRONIC CHEM INC [US]) [Y] 1-19 * claims 1-28 *; | [A]WO03091376 (EKC TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1* page 35, line 16 - line 17; claims 1-4, 12, 13, 17-19 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, no. 16, Database accession no. 2007-154901, XP002615170 & JP2007003617 A 20070111 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [X] 1,3-5,7,15-19 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 13] , [0 14] , [0 23] , [0 26] , [0 27]; example 4; table 2 * | Examination | WO0136578 | JP2009117504 | by applicant | US5279771 | US5419779 | US5630904 | JP3513491B | JP3871257B | JP4147320B |