EP2263646 - Styling composition with high holding power in humidity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knappe, Thorsten Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Am Teich 14 22869, Schenefeld / DE | 02 /
Scheffler, Rene Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Moortwiete 2s 25479, Ellerau / DE | [2010/51] | Application number, filing date | 10177608.6 | 16.06.2008 | [2010/51] | Priority number, date | DE20071053955 | 09.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007053955 | [2010/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2263646 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/73, A61K8/81, A61Q5/06 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
A61Q5/06 (EP);
A61K8/73 (EP);
A61K8/737 (EP);
A61K8/8147 (EP);
A61K8/8182 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Stylingmittel mit hohem Haltegrad bei Feuchtigkeit | [2010/51] | English: | Styling composition with high holding power in humidity | [2010/51] | French: | Composition de coiffage avec tenue forte en atmosphère humide | [2010/51] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/51] | 26.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/12] | 07.11.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/12] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08761062.2 / EP2205207 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080761062) is 04.11.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3716381 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-9 * claims 1,3,7,10,15,16 * * page 3, lines 39-42 * * page 4, lines 37-41 * * page 4, line 44 - page 5, line 3 * * page 4, line 61 * * pages 6-9; examples 1,4,9,10,13 * * page 7, lines 44-55 *; | [Y]DE4314305 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR2709954 (OREAL [FR]) [Y] 1-9 * claims 1,4,7,15,16,18 * * pages 3-4 * * page 9; example 2 * * page 10; example 5 * * page 12; example 7 *; | [A]WO9819653 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * claims 1-3 * * page 1, lines 8,19-32 * * page 9, line 31 - page 10, line 2 * * page 10, lines 2-12 * * page 15, lines 22-25 *; | [A]FR2816833 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-9 * page 15; example Mo *; | [A]EP1348420 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-9 * claims 1,3,6,14,16 * * page 2, paragraphs 2,5 * * page 12, line 55 ** page 12; examples 2,3 *; | [I]DE10247694 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [I] 1-9 * claims 1,9,13,14 * * page 2, paragraph 6 * * page 2, paragraph 10 * * page 3, paragraphs 23-26 * * page 4, lines 6,7 * * page 4, paragraph 28 * * page 4, paragraph 34 * * page 12; examples 1-6 * * pages 6-8, paragraphs 50,51 *; | [A]EP1591103 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-9 * page 8; example 1 *; | [A]EP1712256 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 3, paragraph 13 * * page 3, paragraph 22 * * page 4, paragraph 27 * * page 6; example 5 *; | [A]WO2006130373 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * claim 1 * * page 1, lines 24-28 * * pages 13-19; examples 1-7 * * pages 21-23; examples 8,9 *; | [Y] - REINHARDT, "Hair fixation: A new high-performance polymer", PARFUMS, COSMETIQUES, AROMES, SOCIETE D'EXPANSION TECHNIQUE ET ECONOMIQUE S.A. PARIS, FR, (19950101), vol. 123, ISSN 0337-3029, pages 56 - 61, XP009115376 [Y] 1-9 * the whole document * | [Y] - VLACHY ET AL, "Solubilization of methacrylic acid based polymers by surfactants in acidic solutions", JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, ACADEMIC PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20070925), vol. 315, no. 2, ISSN 0021-9797, pages 445 - 455, XP022267663 [Y] 1-9 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcis.2007.06.083 | Examination | - BASF, "Luviflex Soft. Film-forming agent for hair-styling mousses", INTERNET CITATION, (200505), page 8pp, URL: http://www.cosmetics.basf.de/pdf/Statements/Technical%20Informations/EN/Cosmetic%20Ingredients/MEMKH%20100207e_Luviflex%20Soft.pdf, (20090415), XP007908197 | by applicant | DE4413686 | DE19736906 | DE19738866 | DE19756454 | - Römpp-Lexikon Chemie, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, (1997), page 1764 |