EP2282517 - Electronic program guide with digital storage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rovi Guides, Inc. 2830 De La Cruz Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | [2015/37] |
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states United Video Properties, Inc. 2830 De La Cruz Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | ||
Former [2011/06] | For all designated states United Video Properties, Inc. 7140 South Lewis Avenue Tulsa, OK 74136 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hasssell, Joel G. 8246 Yarrow Court Arvada, CO 80005 / US | 02 /
Knudson, Edward B. 11055 West Rowland Avenue Littleton, CO 80127 / US | 03 /
Hedges, Joe L. 1816 South Carson, Apt. 324 Tulsa, OK 74119 / US | 04 /
Ellis, Michael D. 1300 Kingwood Place Boulder, CO 80304 / US | 05 /
Berezowski, David M. 6706 South 91st East Avenue Tulsa, OK 74133 / US | [2011/13] |
Former [2011/06] | 01 /
Hasssell, Joel G. 8246 Yarrow Court Arvada, CO 80005 / US | ||
02 /
Knudson, Edward B. 11055 West Rowland Avenue Littleton, CO 80127 / US | |||
03 /
Hedges, L. Joe 9311 South Norwood Tulsa, OK 74137 / US | |||
04 /
Ellis, Michael D. 1300 Kingwood Place Boulder, CO 80304 / US | |||
05 /
Berezowski, David M. 6706 South 91st East Avenue Tulsa, OK 74133 / US | Representative(s) | Curran, Clair, et al Ropes & Gray International LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/06] | Bryn-Jacobsen, Caelia, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10177719.1 | 16.09.1999 | [2011/06] | Priority number, date | US19980157256 | 17.09.1998 Original published format: US 157256 | [2011/06] | Previously filed application, date | EP20080000260 | 16.09.1999 | [2011/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2282517 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2282517 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/00, H04N5/445, G11B27/00, G11B27/034, G11B27/11, G11B27/34, G06F17/30, H04N21/432, H04N21/482 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
G11B27/002 (EP,CN,US);
H04N5/93 (KR);
H04N21/42661 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/47217 (US);
G11B27/034 (EP,CN,US);
G11B27/102 (US);
G11B27/105 (EP,CN,US);
G11B27/107 (EP,CN,US);
G11B27/11 (EP,CN,US);
G11B27/327 (US);
G11B27/328 (EP,CN,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,CN,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/2387 (US);
H04N21/4147 (US);
H04N21/42204 (US);
H04N21/42224 (US);
H04N21/4312 (US);
H04N21/4325 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/4332 (US);
H04N21/4334 (US);
H04N21/4335 (US);
H04N21/4345 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/4358 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/43615 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/43622 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/4532 (US);
H04N21/458 (US);
H04N21/47 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/47202 (US);
H04N21/47214 (KR,US);
H04N21/4722 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/4755 (US);
H04N21/482 (KR,US);
H04N21/4821 (US);
H04N21/4825 (US);
H04N21/485 (US);
H04N21/4856 (US);
H04N21/6118 (US);
H04N21/6143 (US);
H04N21/6587 (US);
H04N21/812 (US);
H04N21/84 (US);
H04N21/8455 (US);
H04N21/8456 (US);
H04N21/85406 (US);
H04N5/445 (KR);
H04N5/765 (EP,CN,US);
H04N5/775 (EP,CN,US);
H04N7/163 (US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
G11B2220/41 (EP,US);
G11B2220/90 (EP,US);
H04N5/77 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/06] | H04N5/00, H04N5/445, G11B27/00, G11B27/034, G11B27/11, G11B27/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2011/06] | Title | German: | Elektronischer Programmführer mit digitaler Speicherung | [2011/06] | English: | Electronic program guide with digital storage | [2011/06] | French: | Guide de programme électronique avec stockage numérique | [2011/06] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2010 | Examination requested [2011/06] | 14.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.11.2015 | 12.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/14] | 30.11.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/14] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08000260.3 / EP1914645 | EP99948321.7 / EP1110387 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990948321) is 14.01.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5339393 (DUFFY ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 50 * * column 3, line 64 - column 11, line 38 *; | [A]CA2260993 (APPLIED MAGIC INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 1, line 30 - page 3, line 22 * * page 4, line 25 - page 15, line 34 *; | [X]US5760767 (SHORE SAMUEL R [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * column 3, line 51 - column 9, line 25 * * column 12, line 44 - column 13, line 7 *; | [A]US5808628 (HINSON NEIL ROY [GB], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 8 ** column 7, line 44 - column 8, line 27 * |